Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0766706 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0766706



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 600
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
27.10.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
07.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.08.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 51
11.04.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.04.2008 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 10
29.02.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
01.02.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
11.01.2008 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
20.12.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.12.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
10.12.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
18.09.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.05.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
08.05.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.11.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
11.11.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
04.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
04.11.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
17.10.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
10.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.09.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.09.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.09.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
20.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2005 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 10
05.07.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 9
15.06.2005 Authorisation Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.03.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 4
19.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.09.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.09.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 2
20.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.02.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
05.02.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 6
20.01.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.05.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.05.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
08.05.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
05.03.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.10.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.10.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.09.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.09.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.09.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.09.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.09.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
13.09.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
13.09.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.09.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.09.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.09.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
13.09.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.09.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
13.09.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.09.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
02.11.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.08.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.06.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.06.2001 Description Search / examination 1
06.06.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.04.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.04.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
20.02.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
22.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
22.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
22.05.2000 Description Search / examination 5
22.05.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.02.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
09.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
09.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
09.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
09.08.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.06.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
19.02.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
10.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
10.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
10.08.1998 Description Search / examination 9
10.08.1998 Description Search / examination 9
10.08.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.06.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.02.1998 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
19.12.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.12.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.11.1997 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
17.11.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
15.10.1997 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.05.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.12.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.12.1996 Annex Search / examination 18
16.12.1996 Claims Search / examination 3
16.12.1996 Description Search / examination 14
16.12.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.02.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.12.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
28.12.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 20
28.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 20