EP0715640 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milliken & Company 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg, SC 29304 / US | [1999/37] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg, South Carolina 29303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCO, Francis, William 201 Thomas Road Pauline, SC 29374 / US | 02 /
MICHIELS, Dany, Felix, Maria Bruulstraat 1 B-9450 Haaltert / BE | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd and Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95923928.6 | 15.06.1995 | [1996/24] | WO1995US07676 | Priority number, date | US19940267781 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: US 267781 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600749 | Date: | 11.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715640 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715640 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/06, C09J163/00 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
C09J119/006 (EP,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08L2666/08 (EP,US);
C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
Y10S524/915 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J119/006, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C09J163/00, C08L2666/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/24] | Title | German: | KLEBESTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1996/24] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION | [1996/24] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHESIVE | [1996/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS49133431 ; | [A]US3419450 (KRYSIAK HENRY R) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 15 *; | [A]US4259404 (VAN GILS GERARD E) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,3 ** column 4, line 24 - line 25 *; | [X]EP0235988 (GENCORP INC [US]) [X] 1,11 * claims 1,3,8 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 75-20142W, & JPS49133431 A 00000000 (KANEBO CO. LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |