Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0774109

EP0774109 - PROCESS FOR DETERMINING THE VIBRATION CHARACTERISTICS OF A BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FREYMANN, Raymond
Bahnhofstrasse 27
D-85386 Eching / DE
02 / HONSBERG, Wolfram
Pfarrer-Gammel-Strasse 16
D-84405 Dorfen / DE
03 / WINTER, Franz
Dantestrasse 8
D-80637 München / DE
04 / STEINBICHLER, Hans
Am Bauhof 4
D-83115 Neubeuern / DE
[1997/21]
Application number, filing date95924242.114.06.1995
[1997/21]
WO1995EP02316
Priority number, dateDE1994442769204.08.1994         Original published format: DE 4427692
[1997/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9604532
Date:15.02.1996
Language:DE
[1996/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0774109
Date:21.05.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0774109
Date:04.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search reportEP15.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:G01H13/00, G01H9/00
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/21]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DES SCHWINGUNGSVERHALTENS EINES KÖRPERS[1997/21]
English:PROCESS FOR DETERMINING THE VIBRATION CHARACTERISTICS OF A BODY[1997/21]
French:PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DES CARACTERISTIQUES VIBRATOIRES D'UN CORPS[1997/21]
Entry into regional phase28.02.1997National basic fee paid 
28.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/21]
13.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
30.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2000Fee for grant paid
04.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination16.02.1999Appeal received No.  T0738/99
10.06.1999Statement of grounds filed
15.10.1999Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1999/42]
26.11.1999Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1999/48]
30.03.2000Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)05.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199703   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.1997
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0215660  (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 23 *
 [X]  - WECK M ET AL, "SCHWINGUNGSFORMANALYSE MIT HOLOGRAFISCHER INTERFEROMETRIE UND MODALANALYSE ANALYSIS OF VIBRATION FORMS WITH HOLOGRAPHIC INTERFEROMETRY AND MODAL ANALYSIS", TECHNISCHES MESSEN TM 1982 - 1988 INCOMPLETE, vol. 60, no. 6, pages 228 - 234, XP000377568 [X] 1-3,5 * page 229, column 1, line 1 - page 230, column 2, line 17 *
 [X]  - BAYON A ET AL, "MEASUREMENT OF THE LONGITUDINAL AND TRANSVERSE VIBRATION FREQUENCIES OF A ROD BY SPECKLE INTERFEROMETRY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (19930501), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 265 - 269, XP000382843 [X] 1,2,4 * page 265, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 13 * * page 266, column 1, line 3 - line 10 * * page 268, column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.216840
 [X]  - G.O.ROSVOLD, "Video-based vibration analysis using projected fringes", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK US, (19940210), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 775 - 786, XP000429136 [X] 1,2,6 * page 775, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 23 * * page 781, column 2, line 19 - line 36; figure 4A *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.33.000775
by applicant   - "Schwingungsformanalyse mit holografischer Interferometrie und Modalanalyse", TECHNISCHES MESSEN TM 1982-1988, (199306), vol. 60, no. 6, pages 228 - 234,
    - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (199305), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 265 - 269,