Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0765308

EP0765308 - ENZYME INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford
Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]For all designated states
THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HODSON, Harold, Francis
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
02 / PALMER, Richard M.J.
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
03 / SAWYER, David, Alan
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
04 / KNOWLES, Richard, Graham
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
05 / FRANZMANN, Karl, Witold
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
06 / DRYSDALE, Martin, James
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
07 / SMITH, Steven
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
08 / DAVIES, Patricia, Ifeyinwa
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
09 / CLARK, Helen, Alice, Rebecca
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
10 / SHEARER, Barry, George
203 Wintermist Drive
Cary, NC 27513 / US
[2000/34]
Former [1997/14]01 / .1DSON, Harold, Francis
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
02 / PALMER, Richard M.J.
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
03 / SAWYER, David, Alan
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
04 / KNOWLES, Richard, Graham
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
05 / FRANZMANN, Karl, Witold
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
06 / DRYSDALE, Martin, James
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
07 / SMITH, Steven
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
08 / DAVIES, Patricia, Ifeyinwa
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
09 / CLARK, Helen, Alice, Rebecca
Langley Court
Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB
10 / SHEARER, Barry, George
203 Wintermist Drive
Cary, NC 27513 / US
Representative(s)Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell , et al
Glaxo Wellcome plc
Glaxo Wellcome House
Berkeley Avenue
Greenford
Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell , et al
Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Application number, filing date95924405.414.06.1995
[1997/14]
WO1995GB01378
Priority number, dateEP1994030431415.06.1994         Original published format: EP 94304314
GB1995000977415.05.1995         Original published format: GB 9509774
[1997/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9534534
Date:21.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0765308
Date:02.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995
[1997/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0765308
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07C317/48, C07C317/50, C07C317/02, C07C327/58, A61K31/195
[1997/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/14]
Extension statesLT13.11.1996
LV13.11.1996
SI13.11.1996
TitleGerman:ENZYMHEMMER[1997/14]
English:ENZYME INHIBITORS[1997/14]
French:INHIBITEURS D'ENZYMES[1997/14]
Entry into regional phase13.11.1996National basic fee paid 
13.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/14]
02.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.1999Fee for grant paid
04.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99116304.9  / EP0957087
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9313055  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [DX] 1,6-8,12,14 * claims 1,2,10,11 *;
 [X]EP0200051  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 10 * page 2 *;
 [X]DE4310202  (CIBA GEIGY [CH]) [X] 10 * abstract *;
 [X]DE830640  (MAY & BAKER LIMITED) [X] 10 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - HOUBEN-WEYL " Methoden der organischen Chemie", Bd E5, STUTTGART . NEW YORK, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, [X] 11 * pages 931 , 1263 *
 [X]  - HERMANN, PETER ET AL., "Synthesis of some sulfur-containing amino acid analogs", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19700330), vol. 72, no. 13, Database accession no. 67238p, [X] 12 * abstract *
    [] - J. PRAKT. CHEM., vol. 311, no. 6, pages 1018 - 1028,
 [X]  - DONALD T. ELMORE ET AL., "Kinetics and mechanism of catalysis by proteolytic enzymes...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19670522), vol. 66, no. 21, Database accession no. 91926h, [X] 12 * abstract *
    [] - BIOCHEM J., vol. 102, pages 728 - 34,