Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0770160

EP0770160 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE REPAIR OF BRIDGE JOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Skoglund, Jan
Älgvägen 21
137 32 Västerhaninge / SE
For all designated states
Pulls, Hans
Margretelundsvägen 103
161 35 Bromma / SE
[1997/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Janson, Ronny , et al
Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB
Box 10316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]Janson, Ronny , et al
Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 10316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date95925226.306.07.1995
[1997/18]
WO1995SE00834
Priority number, dateSE1994000239506.07.1994         Original published format: SE 9402395
[1997/18]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9601342
Date:18.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0770160
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.1996
[1997/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0770160
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:E01D19/06
[1997/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE REPARATUR VON BRÜCKENFUGEN[1997/18]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE REPAIR OF BRIDGE JOINTS[1997/18]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA REPARATION DES JOINTS DE PONT[1997/18]
Entry into regional phase19.02.1996Translation filed 
31.01.1997National basic fee paid 
31.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
31.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/18]
18.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2001Fee for grant paid
25.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199703   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.05.2001
CH30.05.2001
FR30.05.2001
IT30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
GB30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2004/35]AT30.05.2001
CH30.05.2001
FR30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
GB30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
Former [2003/09]AT30.05.2001
CH30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
NL30.05.2001
GB30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/37]AT30.05.2001
CH30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
GB30.08.2001
DE31.08.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/18]AT30.05.2001
CH30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
DE31.08.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/15]AT30.05.2001
CH30.05.2001
LI30.05.2001
DE31.08.2001
Former [2002/14]AT30.05.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US3687022  (BROWN DELMONT D);
 [A]US3595141  (BONEY DONALD R, et al);
 [A]US3776654  (BROWN D)