Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0804591

EP0804591 - SERUM PARAOXONASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.
9410 Key West Avenue
Rockville, MD 20850-3338 / US
[1997/45]
Inventor(s)01 / HUDSON, Peter L.
19041 Highstream Drive
Germantown, MD 20874 / US
02 / HE, Wei Wu
6225 Free Stone Court
Columbia, MD 21045 / US
03 / RUBEN, Steven M.
18528 Heritage Hills Drive
Olney, MD 20832 / US
[1997/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date95925340.228.06.1995
[1997/45]
WO1995US08111
Priority number, dateUS1994027058305.07.1994         Original published format: US 270583
[1997/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9601322
Date:18.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0804591
Date:05.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.1996
[1997/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0804591
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.01.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/55, C12N15/11, C12N15/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/16, C12N9/18
[1998/29]
Former International [1997/45]C12N15/55, C12N15/11, C12N15/10, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/45]
TitleGerman:PARAOXONASE AUS SERUM[1997/45]
English:SERUM PARAOXONASE[1997/45]
French:PARAOXONASE SERIQUE[1997/45]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase04.02.1997National basic fee paid 
04.02.1997Search fee paid 
04.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
18.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2002Fee for grant paid
26.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02000397.6  / EP1217007
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]  SMOLEN A ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF THE GENETICALLY DETERMINED ALLOZYMIC FORMS OF HUMAN SERUM PARAOXONASE ARYLESTERASE.", DRUG METAB DISPOS 19 (1). 1991. 107-112. CODEN: DMDSAI ISSN: 0090-9556, XP002065784 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  R. HUMBERT ET AL., "The molecular basis of the human serum paraoxonase activity polymorphism", NATURE GENETICS, (199301), vol. 3, pages 73 - 76, XP002065785 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0193-73
International search[A]  - CHEMICAL AND BIOLOGICAL INTERACTIONS, Volume 87, issued 1993, C.E. FURLONG et al., "Human and Rabbit Paraoxonases: Purification, Cloning, Sequencing, Mapping and Role of Polymorphism in Organophosphate Detoxification", pages 35-48.,
 [Y]  - FASEB JOURNAL, Volume 7, Number 4, issued 23 February 1993, S. ADKINS et al., "Recombinant Human Paraoxonase Has Both Organophosphatase and Arylesterase Activities", page A803, Abstract Number 4641.,
 [Y]  - BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, Volume 298, issued 1994, J. SHAW et al., "Nucleotide Sequence of a Novel Arylesterase Gene From Vibrio Mimicus and Characterization of the Enzyme Expressed in Escherichia Coli", pages 675-680.,
 [A]  - BIOCHEMISTRY, Volume 30, Number 42, issued 1991, C. HASSETT et al., "Characterization of cDNA Clones Encoding Rabbit and Human Serum Paraoxonase: The Mature Protein Retains Its Signal Sequence", pages 10141-10149.,
 [A]  - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, Volume 52, issued 1993, S. ADKINS et al., "Molecular Basis for the Polymorphic Forms of Human Serum Paraoxonase/Arylesterase: Glutamine or Arginine at Position 191, for the Respective A or B Allozymes", pages 598-608.,
 [A]  - CHEMICAL AND BIOLOGICAL INTERACTIONS, Volume 87, issued 1993, B.N. LA DU et al., "Studies on Human Serum Paraoxonase/Arylesterase", pages 25-34.,