Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715731

EP0715731 - Method and system for scrolling through data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/24]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SCROLLING THROUGH DATA
[1999/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MATTHEWS, Joseph, Howard, III
1907 - 232nd Place N.E.
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
02 / GALLANT, James, C.
7109 - 38th Avenue S.W.
Seattle, WA 98126 / US
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95925456.626.06.1995
[1996/24]
WO1995US08360
Priority number, dateUS1994026538124.06.1994         Original published format: US 265381
[1996/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9600417
Date:04.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0715731
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715731
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033, G11B27/34
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/24]
TitleGerman:Methode und System zum Durchblättern von Daten[1999/40]
English:Method and system for scrolling through data[1999/51]
French:Procédé et système pour faire défiler des données[1999/51]
Former [1996/24]METHODE UND SYSTEM ZUR VERSCHIEBUNG DURCH DATEN
Former [1996/24]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SCROLLING THROUGH DATA
Former [1996/24]PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR FAIRE DEFILER DES DONNEES
Entry into regional phase21.02.1996National basic fee paid 
21.02.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
08.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2000Fee for grant paid
26.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199703   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.1997
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0529770  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP) [X] 1,2,7-13,15-17,21 * column 9, line 10 - column 13, line 56 * [A] 14;
 [A]FR2663140  (APPLE COMPUTER) [A] 1,4,5,7-10,14,16-19,21 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 4 * * page 7, line 16 - page 14, line 24 *;
 [A]EP0410579  (SONY CORP) [A] 1,3,7-14,17,21 * column W *
 [A]  - MILLS M. ET AL, "A Magnifier Tool for Video Data", ACM CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, MONTEREY, CALIFORNIA, pages 93 - 98, XP000426811 [A] 1,3,7-14,17,21 * the whole document *