Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0723701

EP0723701 - SOLID-STATE IMAGE INTENSIFIER AND X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING A SOLID-STATE IMAGE INTENSIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/31]SOLID-STAGE IMAGE INTENSIFIER AND X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING A SOLID-STATE IMAGE INTENSIFIER
[1998/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For:FR  GB  NL 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
[2008/39]
Former [2000/02]For:FR  GB  NL 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
Former [1996/31]For:FR  GB  NL 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH
Wendenstrasse 35c
20097 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖRNER, Herbert, Friedrich
Baron-Voghtstrasse 89c
D-22609 Hamburg / DE
[1996/31]
Representative(s)Cohen, Julius Simon
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]Cohen, Julius Simon
International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date95925982.108.08.1995
[1996/31]
WO1995IB00620
Priority number, dateDE1994442845011.08.1994         Original published format: DE 4428450
EP1994020234017.08.1994         Original published format: EP 94202340
[1996/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9605607
Date:22.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0723701
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0723701
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01J31/50
[1996/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/31]
TitleGerman:FESTKÖRPER-BILDVERSTÄRKER UND RÖNTGENUNTERSUCHUNGSGERÄT MIT EINEM FESTKÖRPER-BILDVERSTÄRKER[1996/31]
English:SOLID-STATE IMAGE INTENSIFIER AND X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING A SOLID-STATE IMAGE INTENSIFIER[1998/38]
French:INTENSIFICATEUR D'IMAGES A ETAT SOLIDE ET APPAREIL D'EXAMEN A RAYONS X COMPRENANT UN TEL INTENSIFICATEUR[1996/31]
Former [1996/31]SOLID-STAGE IMAGE INTENSIFIER AND X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING A SOLID-STATE IMAGE INTENSIFIER
Entry into regional phase13.05.1996National basic fee paid 
13.05.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
09.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.01.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.1999Fee for grant paid
29.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Request for further processing for:22.02.1999Request for further processing filed
22.02.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL12.01.2000
GB08.08.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2001/28]GB08.08.2000
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US2505601  (BENDER JR WELCOME W, et al);
 [XAY]US2301967  (NOSKER PAUL W, et al);
 [XAY]US2971364  (GATCOMBE ERNEST K);
 [YA]US2974536  (YORGIADIS ALEXANDER J);
 [YA]US3277697  (WITTKUHNS BRUNO A);
 [A]US5005439  (JENSEN WILLIAM S [US], et al);
 [A]US4495433  (SHERIDAN ANTHONY A [US])
Examination   Nature, vol. 347, 1990, page 539