Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0750818

EP0750818 - VIDEO SIGNAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/39]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/01]For all designated states
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE HAAN, Gerard
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
02 / KWAAITAAL-SPASSOVA, Tatiana Georgieva
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[1997/01]
Representative(s)Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1997/01]Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date95926468.011.08.1995
[1997/01]
WO1995IB00633
Priority number, dateEP1994020330514.11.1994         Original published format: EP 94203305
[1997/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9615624
Date:23.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0750818
Date:02.01.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0750818
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/21
[1997/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/01]
TitleGerman:VIDEOSIGNALVERARBEITUNG[1997/01]
English:VIDEO SIGNAL PROCESSING[1997/01]
French:TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL VIDEO[1997/01]
Entry into regional phase14.08.1996National basic fee paid 
14.08.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/04]
27.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT26.01.2000
[2008/06]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0601655  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]);
 [A]EP0581059  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]JP05344389
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 174, E-1530; & JP,A,05 344 389 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD), 24 December 1993.,