Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777579

EP0777579 - THINNED HALFTONE DOT PATTERNS FOR INKJET PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RYLANDER, Richard, L.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1997/24]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date95926621.405.07.1995
[1997/24]
WO1995US08406
Priority number, dateUS1994029560325.08.1994         Original published format: US 295603
[1997/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9605967
Date:29.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0777579
Date:11.06.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996
[1997/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777579
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/205
[1997/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/24]
TitleGerman:VERDÜNNTE HALBTONPUNKTMUSTER FÜR FARBSTRAHLDRUCKEN[1997/24]
English:THINNED HALFTONE DOT PATTERNS FOR INKJET PRINTING[1997/24]
French:MOTIFS DE POINTS DE TRAME AMINCIS POUR IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE[1997/24]
Entry into regional phase21.03.1997National basic fee paid 
21.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
26.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.1999Fee for grant paid
23.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0513989  (HEWLETT-PACKARD) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 21 - column 16, line 37; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9114578  (MANNESMANN A.G.) [A] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 12, line 30; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0516420  (CANON K.K.) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 50 - column 8, line 28; figures 1-3,26ABCD *;
 [A]US4084259  (CAHILL ET AL.) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 14, line 66; figures 1-4 *