Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0771398 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0771398



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 406
01.10.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
01.10.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.10.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.10.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
21.08.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
21.08.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.08.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 26
18.07.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 23
18.07.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
18.07.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
28.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
28.06.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.06.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.06.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
19.06.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
18.06.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.06.2002 Claims Appeal 2
18.06.2002 Claims Appeal 2
18.06.2002 Claims Appeal 2
18.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
18.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
18.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
18.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
18.06.2002 Claims Appeal 2
18.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
18.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
18.06.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
14.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 15
14.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 13
14.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
14.06.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 2
04.01.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.12.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
22.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.12.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.12.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.12.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.06.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
15.06.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.06.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
05.06.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
07.02.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.02.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
06.02.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.02.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.01.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
26.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
22.01.2001 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
22.01.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
22.01.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
22.01.2001 Means of redress Opposition 1
22.01.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.2000 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.11.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.10.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.06.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
27.06.2000 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
27.06.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.06.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.05.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
25.02.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
26.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.01.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
06.09.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.09.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.09.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.07.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.07.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
17.07.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.09.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.06.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.06.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.06.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.05.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 7
27.04.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
23.04.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.04.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.12.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.12.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
01.12.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
26.03.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.03.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.1997 Annex Search / examination 10
14.01.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
14.01.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
19.09.1996 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
19.09.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
01.04.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.02.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.02.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 20
01.02.1996 Priority document Search / examination 20