Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0804536

EP0804536 - GLASS CLEANER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MASTERS, Ronald, Anthony
2300 Catalpa Drive
Loveland, OH 45140 / US
02 / MAILE, Michael, Stephen
2870 Mossybrink Court
Maineville, OH 45039 / US
[1997/45]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
IP Patent Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]Engisch, Gautier , et al
Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date95926772.521.07.1995
[1997/45]
WO1995US09273
Priority number, dateUS1994028477802.08.1994         Original published format: US 284778
US1995037820525.01.1995         Original published format: US 378205
[1997/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9604358
Date:15.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0804536
Date:05.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996
[1997/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0804536
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/43, C11D3/37
[1997/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/45]
TitleGerman:GLASREINIGUNGSMITTEL[1997/45]
English:GLASS CLEANER COMPOSITIONS[1997/45]
French:COMPOSITIONS POUR NETTOYER LE VERRE[1997/45]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1997National basic fee paid 
14.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
22.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.1999Fee for grant paid
16.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000  25.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000  25.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000   
Henkel KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Postfach 33 05 23
80065 München / DE
15.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.02.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
10.03.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0630965  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [PX] 1-3,5,8 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US4606842  (KEYES GEORGE B ET AL) [X] 1,2,11 * column 3; example - *;
 [X]EP0527625  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO) [X] 1,2,11 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]AU458526  (DOW) [X] 1,2,11 * example - *;
 [X]GB2193505  (UNILEVER PLC) [X] 1-4,6 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0590722  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-5,7,9 * page 7; example - *;
 [X]US3591509  (PARKS LAWRENCE ROY ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,9 * example - *;
 [X]WO9100332  (UNILEVER) [X] 1,2,11 * page 14 - page 16; example - * * page 9 - page 10 *;
 [A]EP0595383  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-11 * example - *;
 [A]JPS63309596
 [PX]  - GUTH J ET AL, "MULTIFUNCTIONAL SULFONATED POLYMERS FOR HOUSEHOLD APPLICATIONS", HAPPI HOUSEHOLD AND PERSONAL PRODUCTS INDUSTRY, (19941201), vol. 31, no. 12, page 104, 106, 108, XP000472861 [PX] 1,2,10 * example 5 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-036140, & JPS63309596 A 19881216 (LION CORP) [A] 1,2,10 * abstract *