Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0772867

EP0772867 - MUSICAL INSTRUMENT FOR GENERATING AT LEAST ONE SOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/20]DEVICE FOR GENERATING AT LEAST ONE SOUND
[1999/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senn, Friedrich
Gottlieber Strasse 23
78462 Konstanz / DE
[1997/20]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Former [1997/20]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat.
Patentanwalt, Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date95926952.319.07.1995
[1997/20]
WO1995EP02840
Priority number, dateDE1994442713330.07.1994         Original published format: DE 4427133
[1997/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9604643
Date:15.02.1996
Language:DE
[1996/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0772867
Date:14.05.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0772867
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:G10K1/26
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/20]
TitleGerman:MUSIKINSTRUMENT ZUM ERZEUGEN VON WENIGSTENS EINEM KLANG[1999/17]
English:MUSICAL INSTRUMENT FOR GENERATING AT LEAST ONE SOUND[1999/17]
French:INSTRUMENT MUSICAL GENERATEUR D'AU MOINS UN SON[1999/17]
Former [1997/20]VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON WENIGSTENS EINEM TON
Former [1997/20]DEVICE FOR GENERATING AT LEAST ONE SOUND
Former [1997/20]DISPOSITIF GENERATEUR D'AU MOINS UN SON
Entry into regional phase21.02.1997National basic fee paid 
21.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/20]
05.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.1999Fee for grant paid
09.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Request for further processing for:12.06.1998Request for further processing filed
12.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.06.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT23.05.2000
[2001/09]
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2410329  (FIAMM SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4,8-16 * page 3, line 9 - line 28; figures 4,12 * [Y] 6,7;
 [XA]FR1556799  (BASSANI S.P.A.) [X] 1,2,5,15-18 * page 1, column R, line 36 - page 2, column L, line 6 * [A] 8-14;
 [Y]US4630465  (HATTON BRUCE M [US]) [Y] 6,7 * figure 5 *;
 [PX]DE4306522  (AUERSWALD JERRY [DE]) [PX] 1,4,5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3102510  (HERSHEY HAROLD J, et al) [A] 1,4,5,8,15,16 * the whole document *