Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773776

EP0773776 - A RESEAL WITH A PARTIAL PERFORATION AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CREATING A PARTIAL PERFORATION IN A RESEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HELGREN, R., Hayes
289 Banbury Road
Mundelein, IL 60060 / US
02 / VALENTINCIC, Charles, C.
38540 Pine Grove
Waukegan, IL 60087 / US
[1997/21]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95927271.719.07.1995
[1997/21]
WO1995US09074
Priority number, dateUS1994028558203.08.1994         Original published format: US 285582
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9603961
Date:15.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773776
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773776
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/00, A61M39/04, B26D7/14, B26D3/08
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/21]
TitleGerman:STOPFEN ZUM WIEDERVERSCHLIESSEN MIT PARTIELLER PERFORATION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER PARTIELLEN PERFORATION IN DIESEM STOPFEN[1997/21]
English:A RESEAL WITH A PARTIAL PERFORATION AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CREATING A PARTIAL PERFORATION IN A RESEAL[1997/21]
French:BOUCHON DE SCELLEMENT POSSEDANT UNE PERFORATION PARTIELLE, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CREATION D'UNE PERFORATION PARTIELLE DANS UN TEL BOUCHON[1997/21]
Entry into regional phase16.01.1997National basic fee paid 
16.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/21]
23.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1999Fee for grant paid
15.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]CH628564  (HOFFMANN AG GEB [CH]) [X] 1,3,5,10-14,16,18,21,24-26 * page 3, column L, line 60 - column R, line 13; figure 6 *;
 [YX]EP0544653  (BAXTER INT [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6,8,10-14,16,18,21,23-25,27-29 * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 7; figures 16,19-23 * * column 9, line 49 - line 54 * [X] 26;
 [Y]US2242645  (FROST RAYMOND B) [Y] 1,3,5,10,12-14,16,18,21,24,25 * page 1, column R, line 1 - line 38; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5267966  (PAUL RAM H [US]) [Y] 6,8,23,29 * figure 7 *;
 [Y]WO9319905  (US HEALTH [US]) [Y] 11 * page 6, line 19 - line 27; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO9311828  (ICU MEDICAL INC [US]) [Y] 27,28 * page 8, line 12 - line 16; figure 13 *;
 [PX]US5403293  (GRABENKORT RICHARD W [US]) [PX] 26-28 * column A; figure - *;
 [E]WO9517873  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [E] 26-28 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9403373  (WEST CO [US]) [X] 26-29 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0416467  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 3,16 * column 10, line 35 - line 48; figure 4 *;
 [A]US2612950  (HENRY EWING) [A] 1,21 * column 1, line 11 - line 15 *;
 [A]US3992966  (D AGOSTINO SALVATORE PATRICK) [A] 3,11,12,14,16,21 * column A; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2293721  (MAX ENGLER) [A] 3,11,12,14,16,21 * page 2, line 24 - line 37; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]EP0444566  (ALCATEL FIBRES OPTIQUES [FR]) [A] 3,16,21 * column 5, line 3 - line 30; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0308815  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 5,6,8,9,19,22,23,29 * column 4, line 13 - line 41; figure 6 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 11 *
Examination US3217574
  US2906423
  US2219755
  US1545332
  US1180665