Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0821819

EP0821819 - METHOD OF INSTRUCTING/TUTORING USING A FULL MOTION PERSONAGE IN WINDOW SUPERIMPOSED ON EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beye, Rick, A.
4-30 Lyncrest Avenue
Fairlawn, NJ 07410 / US
[1998/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/06]
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]Powell, Timothy John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/35]Snelgrove, Susan Elizabeth , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [1998/06]Gilding, Martin John , et al
Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date95927438.230.06.1995
[1998/06]
WO1995US09404
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9702551
Date:23.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0821819
Date:04.02.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997
[1998/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0821819
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.01.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G09B5/02, G09B5/06, G09B7/04
[2000/13]
Former International [1998/06]G09B5/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/06]
TitleGerman:AUSBILDUNGSUNTERRICHTSMETHODE UNTER ANZEIGE DES AUF EINEM LERNMATERIALBILD ÜBERLAGERTEN BEWEGTBILDES EINER PERSON[1998/06]
English:METHOD OF INSTRUCTING/TUTORING USING A FULL MOTION PERSONAGE IN WINDOW SUPERIMPOSED ON EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL[1998/06]
French:PROCEDE D'ENSEIGNEMENT/DIRECTION D'ETUDES FAISANT INTERVENIR UN ANIMATEUR EN MOUVEMENT COMPLET EN SUPERPOSITION DANS UNE FENETRE D'ECRAN DIDACTIQUE[1998/06]
Entry into regional phase13.11.1997National basic fee paid 
13.11.1997Search fee paid 
13.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/06]
22.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2002Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.10.1997DE   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1997
16.10.1997FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1997
16.10.1997GB   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1997
16.10.1997IT   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1997
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.10.1997M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1997
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199703   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.1997
Documents cited:Search[X]US5388993  (MCKIEL FRANK A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column A * * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 9 * * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 45; figures 2-4 *
International search[A]US4797750  (KARWEIT MICHAEL J [US]);
 [A]US4804328  (BARRABEE KENT P [US]);
 [A]US4884972  (GASPER ELON [US]);
 [A]JPH02284192  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)