Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777765

EP0777765 - ALUMINIUM-IMMERSED ASSEMBLY FOR ALUMINIUM PRODUCTION CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLTECH Invent S.A.
68-70 Blvd. de la Pêtrusse
2320 Luxembourg / LU
[1997/24]
Inventor(s)01 / DE NORA, Vittorio
Sandrigham House
Nassau / BS
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Cronin, Brian Harold John
CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31
1260 Nyon / CH
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]Cronin, Brian Harold John
c/o MOLTECH S.A. 9, Route de Troinex
1227 Carouge/GE / CH
Application number, filing date95927943.130.08.1995
[1997/24]
WO1995IB00718
Priority number, dateUS1994030752616.09.1994         Original published format: US 307526
[1997/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9608590
Date:21.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0777765
Date:11.06.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996
[1997/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777765
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C25C3/08
[1997/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/24]
TitleGerman:ALUMINIUMGETAUCHTER AUFBAU FÜR ZELLEN ZUR ALUMINIUMPRODUKTION[1997/24]
English:ALUMINIUM-IMMERSED ASSEMBLY FOR ALUMINIUM PRODUCTION CELLS[1997/24]
French:ENSEMBLE IMMERGE DANS UN BAIN D'ALUMINIUM POUR CELLULES DE PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM[1997/24]
Entry into regional phase01.04.1997National basic fee paid 
01.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
11.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.1999Fee for grant paid
29.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2003/09]ES05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
Former [2002/26]ES05.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0096001  (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3-5,10-12,15,19,23 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 10 * * page 7, line 18 - line 22 * * page 11, line 6 * * page 12; example 1 * * figure 4 *;
 [DY]EP0103350  (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [DY] 1,3-5,10-12,15,19,23 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 20 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB2065174  (ALUSUISSE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 108 - page 2, line 52 * * figure 1 *