Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773743

EP0773743 - DOUBLE ACTING ENDOSCOPIC SCISSORS WITH BIPOLAR CAUTERY CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYMBIOSIS CORPORATION
8600, N.W. 41st Street Miami
Florida 33166 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
SYMBIOSIS CORPORATION
8600, N.W. 41st Street
Miami, Florida 33166 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KORTENBACH, Juergen, Andrew
990 Apache Street
Miami Springs, FL 33166 / US
02 / MC BRAYER, Michael, Sean
4044 Park Avenue
Miami, FL 33133 / US
03 / SLATER, Charles, R.
1705 S.W. 4th Street
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312 / US
04 / GOTTLIEB, Saul
7936 N.W. 187th Terrace
Miami, FL 33015 / US
[1997/21]
Representative(s)Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
7th Floor
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales
Swansea, West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date95928255.902.08.1995
[1997/21]
WO1995US09750
Priority number, dateUS1994028479302.08.1994         Original published format: US 284793
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9603927
Date:15.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773743
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.1996
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773743
Date:08.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.02.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/32, A61B18/14, A61B17/28
[2003/33]
Former International [1997/38]A61B17/39, A61B17/28
Former International [1997/21]A61B17/36
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [1997/21]
TitleGerman:DOPPELTWIRKENDE ENDOSKOPISCHE SCHEREN MIT BIPOLARER AUSBRENNUNGSKAPAZITÄT[1997/21]
English:DOUBLE ACTING ENDOSCOPIC SCISSORS WITH BIPOLAR CAUTERY CAPABILITY[1997/21]
French:CISEAUX ENDOSCOPIQUES A DOUBLE ACTION AVEC CAPACITE DE CAUTERISATION BIPOLAIRE[1997/21]
Entry into regional phase28.02.1997National basic fee paid 
28.02.1997Search fee paid 
28.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/21]
05.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2003Fee for grant paid
16.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03011729.5  / EP1366723
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0635244  (EVEREST MEDICAL CORP [US]) [PX] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US4872456  (HASSON HARRITH M [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 24 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US4763669  (JAEGER JOHN C [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 2; figure 13 *
International search[X]US5330471  (EGGERS PHILIP E [US]);
 [AP]US5342381  (TIDEMAND KEVIN K [US])