Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0772489

EP0772489 - CELLULOSIC ULTRAFILTRATION MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MILLIPORE CORPORATION
80 Ashby Road Bedford
Massachusetts 01730 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]For all designated states
MILLIPORE CORPORATION
80 Ashby Road
Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TUCCELLI, Ronald
56 Highland Avenue
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
02 / MCGRATH, Paul, V.
30 Crescent Avenue
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Harvey, David Gareth
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]Harvey, David Gareth
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date95928292.219.07.1995
[1997/20]
WO1995US09836
Priority number, dateUS1994027780620.07.1994         Original published format: US 277806
[1997/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9602317
Date:01.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0772489
Date:14.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.1996
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0772489
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B01D71/10, B01D71/14, B01D69/10
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/20]
TitleGerman:ZELLULOSE ULTRAFILTRATIONSMEMBRANE[1997/20]
English:CELLULOSIC ULTRAFILTRATION MEMBRANE[1997/20]
French:MEMBRANE CELLULOSIQUE POUR ULTRAFILTRATION[1997/20]
Entry into regional phase08.01.1997National basic fee paid 
08.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/20]
21.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2000Fee for grant paid
26.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2000
ES17.05.2000
GR17.05.2000
IT17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
LU19.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/39]AT17.05.2000
ES17.05.2000
GR17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
LU19.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2004/07]AT17.05.2000
ES17.05.2000
GR17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT17.05.2000
ES17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT17.05.2000
ES17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2002/26]AT17.05.2000
ES17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2001/50]AT17.05.2000
IE19.07.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT17.05.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2001/16]AT17.05.2000
PT17.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT17.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0498348  (JAPAN GORE TEX INC [JP]) [A] 1,3,15 * column W *;
 [A]FR2488051  (CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0096339  (GFT INGENIEURBUERO [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column W *;
 [A]US4978451  (TAYLOR JOHN A [US]) [A] 1,4 * column W *;
 [A]FR2380052  (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4828772
 US4778601
    - L. ZEMAN; M. WALES, SEPARATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1981), vol. 16, no. 30, pages 275 - 290,