EP0772782 - SAMPLED-CONTINUOUS PROBABILITY METHOD OF VELOCITY MEASUREMENT OF THE OBJECT HAVING INFORMATIVELY-STRUCTURAL INHOMOGENEITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RELIN, Arkadi 12 Woodbridge Place Langhorne, PA 19053 / US | [2000/43] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states Relin, Arkadi 12 Woodbridge Place Longhorne, PA 19053 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Newby, Martin John Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Newby, Martin John JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95928763.2 | 21.07.1995 | [1997/20] | WO1995US09975 | Priority number, date | US19940278827 | 22.07.1994 Original published format: US 278827 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9603631 | Date: | 08.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0772782 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772782 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/00, G01P5/22, G01F1/708 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
G01F1/712 (EP,US);
G01F1/708 (EP,US);
G01P3/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | G01P5/00, G01P5/22 | ||
Former IPC [1997/20] | G01P5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | GESCHWINDIGKEITSMESSUNG NACH DER WAHRSCHEINLICHKEITSMETHODE MIT KONTINUIERLICHER ABTASTUNG FÜR OBJEKTE MIT STRUKTURELLEN INHOMOGENITÄTEN ALS INFORMATIONTRÄGER | [2000/38] | English: | SAMPLED-CONTINUOUS PROBABILITY METHOD OF VELOCITY MEASUREMENT OF THE OBJECT HAVING INFORMATIVELY-STRUCTURAL INHOMOGENEITY | [1997/20] | French: | PROCEDE A PROBABILITE CONTINUE ECHANTILLONNEE PERMETTANT DE MESURER LES VITESSES D'UN OBJET PRESENTANT UNE INHOMOGENEITE STRUCTURALE INFORMATIVE | [1997/20] |
Former [1997/20] | GESCHWINDIGKEITSMESSUNG NACH DER WAHRSCHEINLICHKEITSMETHODE MIT KONTINUIERLICHER ABTASTUNG FÜR OBJEKTE MIT STRUKTURELLEN INFORMATIONSINHOMOGENITÄTEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 21.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | BE | 05.12.2001 | CH | 05.12.2001 | FR | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | LI | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | SE | 05.03.2002 | DE | 06.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
DE | 06.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
DE | 06.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
DE | 06.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 05.12.2001 | |
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 05.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU1245663 ; | [Y]US4050747 (RUHNAU GERHARD, et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 18; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4177463 (ANDERMO INGVAR [SE]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, lines 6-37 ** column 8, lines 58-68; figures 1-3,17 *; | [D]SU1245663 (RELIN ARKADIJ B, et al); | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 10, Database accession no. 87-071755, XP002061456 & SU1245663 A 19860723 (RELIN A.B.) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4201083 (KURITA YOSHIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4364114 (RENZEL PETER, et al); | [Y]US4896268 (MACGUGAN DOUGLAS C [US]); | [Y]US4956789 (HAMADA YOOSUKE [JP], et al) |