Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0775247

EP0775247 - ROCK BIT WITH ENHANCED FLUID RETURN AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DRESSER INDUSTRIES INC.
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4100 Dallas
Texas 75201-2980 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/22]For all designated states
Dresser Industries Inc.
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4100
Dallas, Texas 75201-2916 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUFFSTUTLER, Alan, Dee
2760 Water Oak
Grand Prairie, TX 75052 / US
[1997/22]
Representative(s)Hogg, Jeffery Keith
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
[2008/35]
Former [1997/24]Hogg, Jeffery Keith
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Former [1997/22]Every, David Aidan , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date95928786.308.08.1995
[1997/22]
WO1995US10051
Priority number, dateUS1994028745708.08.1994         Original published format: US 287457
[1997/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9605405
Date:22.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0775247
Date:28.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996
[1997/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.02.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/18, E21B10/20
[1997/22]
Designated contracting statesGB,   IT [1997/22]
TitleGerman:GESTEINBOHRMEISSEL MIT VERBESSERTEM FLÜSSIGKEITSRÜCKSTROMBEREICH[1997/22]
English:ROCK BIT WITH ENHANCED FLUID RETURN AREA[1997/22]
French:TREPAN A ZONE DE RETOUR DE FLUIDE AMELIOREE[1997/22]
Entry into regional phase05.02.1997National basic fee paid 
05.02.1997Search fee paid 
05.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/22]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
20.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4369849  (PARRISH JOHN D) [X] 1-8,11-20 * column 5, line 39 - line 63; figures 1-8 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]US4106577  (SUMMERS DAVID A) [Y] 9 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US3070182  (RUNTE JOHN F) [A] 1,11,16 * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB725381  (GUSZSTAHLWERK BOCHUMER VER A G) [A] 1,11,16 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5199516  (FERNANDEZ CARLOS [US]) [A] 1,11,16 * figures 1-3,9 *
International search[A]US2047112  (REED CLARENCE E);
 [A]US2063012  (CATLAND ALFRED C);
 [A]US2064273  (SCOTT FLOYD L);
 [A]US2068375  (CATLAND ALFRED C);
 [A]US4417629  (WALLACE DUANE W [US]);
 [A]US4750573  (WYNN KENNETH D [US])