Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0796386

EP0796386 - ARRANGEMENT FOR MOUNTING SWING CYLINDERS IN BOOM FOR ROCK DRILLING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sandvik Tamrock Oy
Pihtisulunkatu 9
33330 Tampere / FI
[2000/20]
Former [1997/39]For all designated states
TAMROCK OY
Pihtisulunkatu 9
SF-33330 Tampere / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LEMMETTY, Pauli
Lemminkäisenkatu 8
FIN-33540 Tampere / FI
[1997/39]
Representative(s)Dahlström, Karl Krister , et al
Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[1997/39]
Application number, filing date95929121.228.08.1995
[1997/39]
WO1995FI00458
Priority number, dateFI1994000397830.08.1994         Original published format: FI 943978
[1997/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9607014
Date:07.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0796386
Date:24.09.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996
[1997/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0796386
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:E21B19/08
[2000/21]
Former International [1997/39]E21C11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   SE [1997/39]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN VON SCHWENKZYLINDERN AN EINEN AUSLEGER IN EINER GESTEINBOHREINHEIT[1997/39]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR MOUNTING SWING CYLINDERS IN BOOM FOR ROCK DRILLING UNIT[1997/39]
French:STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE DE VERINS DE PIVOTEMENT POUR UN BRAS DE PERFORATRICE DE ROCHES[1997/39]
Entry into regional phase31.01.1997National basic fee paid 
31.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/13]
13.03.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
31.05.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/09]
20.09.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [1997/13]
31.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
10.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2000Fee for grant paid
02.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0140873  (VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT])