Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0726267

EP0726267 - QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/33]QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVE
[2000/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2001
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Former [1996/33]For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi I-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIWARA, Shigeki
104-2-403, Icchouda-Mishima-shi
Shizuoka 411 / JP
02 / OKAMURA, Yuko
2151-1-207, Ohoka-Numazu-shi
Shizuoka 410 / JP
03 / TAKAI, Haruki
1188, Shimotogari-Nagaizumi-cho-Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411 / JP
04 / NONAKA, Hiromi
580-71, Tokura-Shimizu-cho-Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411 / JP
05 / MORIYAMA, Takahiro
410-1, Nameri-Nagaizumi-cho-Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411 / JP
06 / YAO, Kozo
586-2, Shimotogari-Nagaizumi-cho-Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411 / JP
07 / KARASAWA, Akira
378-6, Nameri-Nagaizumi-cho-Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411 / JP
[1996/33]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1996/33]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date95929231.925.08.1995
[1996/33]
WO1995JP01694
Priority number, dateJP1994020201826.08.1994         Original published format: JP 20201894
[1996/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9606841
Date:07.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0726267
Date:14.08.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996
[1996/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0726267
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.03.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/14, A61K31/55, A61K31/505
[1996/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/33]
TitleGerman:CHINAZOLIN-DERIVATE[1999/35]
English:QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES[2000/13]
French:DERIVES DE QUINAZOLINE[2000/13]
Former [1996/33]CHINAZOLIN-DERIVAT
Former [1996/33]QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVE
Former [1996/33]DERIVE DE QUINAZOLINE
Entry into regional phase22.05.1996Translation filed 
22.05.1996National basic fee paid 
22.05.1996Search fee paid 
22.05.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/33]
09.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
31.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2000Fee for grant paid
03.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2000
BE22.11.2000
GR22.11.2000
NL22.11.2000
DK22.02.2001
PT22.02.2001
SE22.02.2001
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT22.11.2000
BE22.11.2000
NL22.11.2000
DK22.02.2001
PT22.02.2001
SE22.02.2001
Former [2003/09]AT22.11.2000
BE22.11.2000
NL22.11.2000
PT22.02.2001
SE22.02.2001
Former [2002/11]AT22.11.2000
BE22.11.2000
PT22.02.2001
SE22.02.2001
Former [2002/02]AT22.11.2000
BE22.11.2000
SE22.02.2001
Former [2001/51]AT22.11.2000
SE22.02.2001
Former [2001/37]AT22.11.2000
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPS4969684