blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0776311

EP0776311 - DIVERTER FOR BOTTLE AIR CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OUELLETTE MACHINERY SYSTEMS, INC.
1761 Chase Drive
Fenton, MO 63026 / US
[1997/23]
Inventor(s)01 / OUELLETTE, Joseph, F.
822 East Essex
Glendale, MO 63122 / US
[1997/23]
Representative(s)Copp, David Christopher
Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL
Suffolk / GB
[2008/37]
Former [1997/23]Copp, David Christopher
Dummett Copp & Co. 25 The Square Martlesham Heath
Ipswich Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB
Application number, filing date95929547.814.08.1995
[1997/23]
WO1995US10374
Priority number, dateUS1994029207917.08.1994         Original published format: US 292079
[1997/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9605127
Date:22.02.1996
Language:EN
[1996/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0776311
Date:04.06.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0776311
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.02.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:B65G51/02, B65G15/14
[1997/23]
CPC:
B65G15/14 (EP,US); B65G21/20 (EP,US); B65G47/642 (EP,US);
B65G51/035 (EP,US); B65G2201/02 (EP,US); B65G2201/0244 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0247 (EP,US); B65G2207/14 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/23]
TitleGerman:VERTEILER FÜR FLASCHEN-LUFT-FÖRDERER[1997/23]
English:DIVERTER FOR BOTTLE AIR CONVEYOR[1997/23]
French:PARTITEUR POUR CONVOYEUR A AIR DE BOUTEILLES[1997/23]
Entry into regional phase17.03.1997National basic fee paid 
17.03.1997Search fee paid 
17.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
15.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2000Fee for grant paid
03.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
FR03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
IT03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
LU14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
FR03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
LU14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2004/39]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
LU14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2004/07]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2003/09]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2002/42]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2002/26]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
DE04.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2001/50]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
IE14.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2001/28]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
GB14.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2001/27]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
FR29.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US3075630  (FISK ROBERT W);
 [Y]US3174806  (BARBER EDGAR A, et al);
 [X]US3738260  (NAVI M, et al);
 [Y]US4653630  (BRAVIN ANNA [IT]);
 [X]US4938636  (AIDLIN SAMUEL S [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9010587  (SARCMI SPA [IT]);
 [X]US5100265  (MIRKIN VADIM [US]);
 [X]US5161919  (SMITH PAUL W [US], et al);
 [X]US5246097  (MCCOY BYRON A [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.