Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0734333

EP0734333 - IMMOBILIZATION DEVICE WITH A SHORT UNLOCKING TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1996/40]
Inventor(s)01 / LOCHER, Johannes
Möwenweg 50
D-70378 Stuttgart / DE
02 / FISCHER, Werner
Dickenbergstrasse 9/1
D-71296 Heimsheim / DE
03 / LAICHINGER, Martin
Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 21
D-73061 Ebersbach / DE
[1996/40]
Application number, filing date95929742.502.09.1995
[1996/40]
WO1995DE01190
Priority number, dateDE1994443445027.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4434450
[1996/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9609943
Date:04.04.1996
Language:DE
[1996/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0734333
Date:02.10.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1996
[1996/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0734333
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/04
[1996/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/40]
TitleGerman:WEGFAHRSPERRE MIT KURZER ENTRIEGELUNGSZEIT[1996/40]
English:IMMOBILIZATION DEVICE WITH A SHORT UNLOCKING TIME[1996/40]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMMOBILISATION A COURTE DUREE DE DEBLOCAGE[1996/40]
Entry into regional phase27.06.1996National basic fee paid 
27.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/49]
28.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2001Fee for grant paid
23.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2264536  (HUNTER ADRIAN JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-6;
 [EA]GB2289357  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [EA] 1-6;
 [PA]EP0637529  (WEBER SRL [IT]) [PA] 1-6;
 [A]US4107962  (MACKINNON RICHARD B) [A] 1-6
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, [A] 1-6