Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777669

EP0777669 - 4-(2-AMINO-6-(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)-9H-PURIN-9-YL)-2-CYCLOPENTENE-1-METHANOL SUCCINATE AS ANTIVIRAL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.06.2003  [2003/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford
Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]For all designated states
THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DALUGE, Susan, Mary
297 Azalea Drive
Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US
02 / WILSON, Jeffrey, Douglas
17 Twinleaf Place
Durham, NC 27705 / US
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Quillin, Helen Kaye , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]Quillin, Helen Kaye , et al
Glaxo Wellcome plc Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Application number, filing date95929954.625.08.1995
[1997/24]
WO1995GB02014
Priority number, dateGB1994001724926.08.1994         Original published format: GB 9417249
[1997/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9606844
Date:07.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0777669
Date:11.06.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996
[1997/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777669
Date:03.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/00, A61K31/52
[1997/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/24]
Extension statesLT30.01.1997
LV30.01.1997
SI30.01.1997
TitleGerman:4-[2-AMINO-6-(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)-9H-PYRIN-9-YL]-2-CYCLOPENTEN-1-METHANOL-SUCCINAT ALS ANTIVIRALES MITTEL[1997/24]
English:4-(2-AMINO-6-(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)-9H-PURIN-9-YL)-2-CYCLOPENTENE-1-METHANOL SUCCINATE AS ANTIVIRAL AGENT[1997/24]
French:UTILISATION DU SUCCINATE DE 4-(2-AMINO-6-(CYCLOPROPYLAMINO)-9H-PURIN-9-YL)-2-CYCLOPENTENE-METHANOL COMME AGENT ANTIVIRAL[1997/24]
Entry into regional phase30.01.1997National basic fee paid 
30.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
25.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2002Fee for grant paid
20.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0349242  (THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 3 - line 9; example 5 *;
 [DX]EP0434450  (THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED) [DX] 1-10 * page 4, line 45 - line 47; example 7 *;
 [A]WO9415614  (AGIS INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-3,5 *