Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0786026 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0786026



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 302
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
07.04.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
04.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
15.06.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.06.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
20.05.2005 Claims Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Claims Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.03.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
14.03.2005 N/A Opposition 3
14.03.2005 N/a Opposition 2
07.03.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
01.03.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
28.02.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
28.01.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
19.01.2005 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
29.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.11.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
04.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.11.2004 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 6
03.11.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
03.11.2004 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
28.10.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.08.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.07.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
23.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
27.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.09.2002 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
23.09.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.09.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
11.09.2002 General authorisation Appeal 1
11.09.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.08.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.08.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.07.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
25.07.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
15.03.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.03.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
31.01.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.01.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.01.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.01.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
15.11.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
15.11.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
15.11.2001 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.11.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.11.2001 Text intended for grant Opposition 4
22.10.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
01.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.09.2001 Claims Opposition 2
21.09.2001 Description Opposition 2
21.09.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.03.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.03.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
01.03.2001 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
01.03.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
01.03.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.02.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.12.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.12.2000 Claims Opposition 1
08.12.2000 Description Opposition 2
08.12.2000 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.08.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
09.08.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
31.07.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
04.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.10.1999 Claims Opposition 2
22.10.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
21.06.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.06.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.05.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.05.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.05.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
18.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
18.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.07.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.03.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.03.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.03.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.02.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
12.02.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.01.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
20.01.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
07.01.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.06.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.02.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
09.10.1996 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
09.10.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
24.06.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.05.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
02.05.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
02.05.1996 Priority document Search / examination 18