Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0784697

EP0784697 - BACTERIAL PROCESS FOR THE RESOLUTION OF RACEMIC CIS-DIOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avecia Limited
Hexagon House
Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
[1999/51]
Former [1997/30]For all designated states
ZENECA LIMITED
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ALLEN, Christopher Curtis Royston
48 Windsor Drive
Belfast BT9 7FH / GB
02 / BOYD, Derek Raymond
91 Maryville Park, Malone Road
Belfast BT9 6LQ / GB
03 / DALTON, Howard
Groves Mill, Shakers Lane, Long Itchington
Warwickshire CV23 8QB / GB
[1997/30]
Representative(s)Revell, Christopher
Avecia Limited
Intellectual Property Group
P.O. Box 42
Hexagon House, Blackley, Manchester
M9 8ZS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Revell, Christopher
ZENECA Specialties, Intellectual Property Group, PO Box 42, Hexagon House
Blackley, Manchester, M9 8ZS / GB
Former [1997/30]Mayall, John
Intellectual Property Group Zeneca Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley
Manchester M9 8ZS / GB
Application number, filing date95930597.031.08.1995
[1997/30]
WO1995GB02051
Priority number, dateGB1994002006705.10.1994         Original published format: GB 9420067
[1997/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9611282
Date:18.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0784697
Date:23.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996
[1997/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0784697
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:C12P41/00
[1997/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/30]
TitleGerman:BAKTERIOLOGISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON RACEMATARTIGEN CIS-DIOLEN[1997/30]
English:BACTERIAL PROCESS FOR THE RESOLUTION OF RACEMIC CIS-DIOLS[1997/30]
French:PROCEDE BACTERIEN DE DEDOUBLEMENT DE CIS-DIOLS RACEMIQUES[1997/30]
Entry into regional phase06.05.1997National basic fee paid 
06.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
27.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2000Fee for grant paid
11.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
IT03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
LU31.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/39]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
LU31.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2004/07]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/16]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
PT03.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]  - D R BOYD ET AL., "Stereospecific benzylic hydroxylation of bicyclic alkenes by Pseudomonas putida; isolation of (+)-R-1-hydroxy-1,2-dihydroxynaphtalene, an arene hydrate of naphthalene from metabolism of 1,2-Dihydronaphthalene", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, no. 6, pages 339 - 340, [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - L P WACKETT ET AL., "Benzylic monooxygenation catalyzed by Toluene monooxygenase from Pseudomonas putida", BIOCHEMISTRY, EASTON, PA US, (19880223), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 1360 - 1367, [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - D R BOYD ET AL., "Stereodirecting substituent effects during enzyme-catlysed synthesis of cis-dihydrodiol metabolites of 1,4-Disubstituted benzene substrates", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (19930607), no. 11, pages 974 - 976, [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - C C R ALLEN ET AL., "Enantioselective bacterial biotransformation routes to cis-diol metabolites of monosubstituted benzenes, naphthalene and benzocycloalkenes of either absolute configuration", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, LETCHWORTH GB, (19950121), no. 2, pages 117 - 119, [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *