Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777863

EP0777863 - NAVIGATION INFORMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MANNINGS, Robin, Thomas
12 Mayfields, Martlesham Heath
Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 7TU / GB
02 / WALL, Nigel, David, Charles
9 North Close
Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 2TL / GB
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin , et al
BT Intellectual Property Department
Ground Floor
BT Faraday Building
1 Knightrider Street
London EC4V 5BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin , et al
BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Application number, filing date95930610.101.09.1995
[1997/24]
WO1995GB02065
Priority number, dateGB1994001760001.09.1994         Original published format: GB 9417600
[1997/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9607110
Date:07.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0777863
Date:11.06.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996
[1997/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777863
Date:09.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0777863
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/14, G01S5/00, H04Q7/38, G08G1/127
[1997/24]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/24]
TitleGerman:NAVIGATIONSINFORMATIONSSYTEM[1997/24]
English:NAVIGATION INFORMATION SYSTEM[1997/24]
French:SYSTEME D'INFORMATIONS DE NAVIGATION[1997/24]
Entry into regional phase03.02.1997National basic fee paid 
03.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
18.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.1998Fee for grant paid
11.05.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00203681.2  / EP1085345
EP97203380.7  / EP0837341
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.09.1999   
Mannesmann AG
Mannesmannufer 2
D-40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Peter E.
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Postfach 33 01 30
14171 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/45]
Opponent(s)01  09.09.1999   
Mannesmann AG
Mannesmannufer 2
D-40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing.
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30
14171 Berlin / DE
25.10.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.04.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.03.2001Date of oral proceedings
19.04.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.04.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.10.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.12.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.03.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition29.06.2001Appeal received No.  T0726/01
29.08.2001Statement of grounds filed
18.09.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
20.06.2001Appeal received No.  T0726/01
20.08.2001Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2002Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2002/03]
29.05.2002Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2002/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.04.1997PT   M01   Fee paid on   04.04.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
[2003/47]
Former [2003/43]PT31.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0174540  (GEOSTAR CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,9,17,23,24,30,47,48 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 24; figure 1 * [Y] 2-6,8,10-16,18-22,25-29,31,32,38-46;
 [Y]GB2176964  (STC PLC) [Y] 8 * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [YA]EP0379198  (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 2-6,18-22 * page 3, line 45 - page 6, line 17; figures 1,2 * [A] 33-37;
 [Y]EP0604404  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [Y] 10-15,25-29,31,32,38-46 * page 9, line 58 - page 10, line 23 * * page 11, line 13 - line 45 * * page 12, line 20 - line 24 * * page 18, line 16 - line 42; figures 1,3-5,7-10 *;
 [Y]EP0601293  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 16,29 * column 8, line 14 - column 10, line 2 * * column 11, line 10 - column 12, line 18; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2264837  (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,17,30-32,47,48 * page 5, line 14 - page 9, line 12 * * page 19, line 4 - page 23, line 15; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]GB2271486  (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1,17,30-32,47,48 * page 8, line 11 - line 31 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 33; figures 1,2 *
ExaminationDE4139581
    An informative brochure of VDO Adolf Schindling AG, D-64382 Babenhausen: "Verkehrs-Telematik: Ein Schritt auf dem Weg zur intelligenten Strasse", Mai 1994,
    "Auto-Navigation: Elektronische Lotsen", S. 99-102. Funkschau 22/1986,
    "Telematik für den Verkehr in Europa", VDA presentation on the occasion of the informal meeting of the transport ministers of the European Union and applicant countries on 22 and 23 July 1994 in Ludwigsburg,
    "EURO-SCOUTs adaptability to paradigm shift transportation policies", H. Sodeikat (Siemens AG), Proc. on 26th ISATA, p. 59-66, 1993,