EP0777602 - PROPELLER DE-ICING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/24] | ROTARY APPARATUS | ||
[1999/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULTRA ELECTRONICS LIMITED 417 Bridport Road Greenford Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states ULTRA ELECTRONICS LIMITED 417 Bridport Road Greenford, Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, James, Andrew, Timothy 91 Barrowby Road Grantham Lincolnshire NG31 8AE / GB | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyers Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95930626.7 | 04.09.1995 | [1997/24] | WO1995GB02082 | Priority number, date | GB19940017639 | 02.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9417639 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607588 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777602 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777602 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B64D15/12, G08C17/04 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
B64D15/12 (EP,US);
G08C17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, SE [2001/04] |
Former [1997/24] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | PROPELLERENTEISUNGSAPPARAT | [1999/24] | English: | PROPELLER DE-ICING APPARATUS | [1999/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE DEGIVRAGE D'HELICE | [1999/24] |
Former [1997/24] | ROTIERENDER APPARAT | ||
Former [1997/24] | ROTARY APPARATUS | ||
Former [1997/24] | APPAREIL ROTATIF | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 17.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.04.2000 | LI | 05.04.2000 | [2002/02] | Cited in | International search | [YD]GB2264812 (DOWTY DEFENCE & AIR SYST [GB]) [YD] 1-3,8,9,12-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0530612 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,8,9,12-15 * page 3, column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2281273 (BRONZAVIA SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2671650 (WESTLAND AEROSTRUCTURES LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5144299 (SMITH DAVID C [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 19 * |