Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731690

EP0731690 - LIPOSOMES WITH ENHANCED ENTRAPMENT CAPACITY, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/38]LIPOSOMES WITH ENHANCED ENTRAPMENT CAPACITY, METHOD AND USE
[2002/33]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRACCO RESEARCH S.A.
31, route de la Galaise
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
[1998/19]
Former [1996/38]For all designated states
BRACCO RESEARCH S.A.
7, Route de Drize
1227 Carouge-Genève / CH
Inventor(s)01 / TOURNIER, Hervé
300, Le Riondet
F-74520 Valleiry / FR
02 / SCHNEIDER, Michel
34, route d'Annecy
CH-1256 Troinex / CH
03 / GUILLOT, Christian
Les Eplanes
F-74160 Le Châble-Beaumont / FR
[1996/38]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1999/36]
Former [1998/26]Tomov-Grisogono, Nenad , et al
Bracco Research S.A., 31, route de Galaise
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
Application number, filing date95930698.628.09.1995
[1996/38]
WO1995IB00802
Priority number, dateAT1957009481030.09.1994         Original published format: AT 9481057
[1996/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9610393
Date:11.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0731690
Date:18.09.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1996
[1996/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731690
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/127
[1996/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/38]
TitleGerman:LIPOSOMEN MIT ERHÖHTEM EINSCHLUSSVERMÖGEN, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[1996/38]
English:LIPOSOMES WITH ENHANCED ENTRAPMENT CAPACITY, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF[2002/33]
French:LIPOSOMES A CAPACITE DE PIEGEAGE AMELIORE, SA PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION[2002/33]
Former [1996/38]LIPOSOMES WITH ENHANCED ENTRAPMENT CAPACITY, METHOD AND USE
Former [1996/38]LIPOSOMES A CAPACITE DE PIEGAGE AMELIOREE, PROCEDE ET UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase26.04.1996National basic fee paid 
26.04.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
01.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.2004   
Amersham plc
Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Amersham
Bucks HP7 9NA / GB
Opponent's representative
Flechsler, Insa
GE Healthcare Limited
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont
Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2004/19]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2004   
Amersham plc
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Amersham Bucks HP7 9NA / GB
Opponent's representative
Flechsler, Insa
Amersham plc, Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Bucks HP7 9NA / GB
19.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.10.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.02.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2007
05.02.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2007Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
18.02.2007Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/26]
13.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:13.02.2003Request for further processing filed
13.02.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Stay/Interruption01.10.1999Resumption of proceedings
03.09.1998Interruption of proceedings, reason: representative died
[1999/36]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
AT28.09.2004
IE28.09.2004
LU28.09.2004
ES29.09.2004
SE29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
NL01.04.2005
[2007/16]
Former [2006/14]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
AT28.09.2004
IE28.09.2004
ES29.09.2004
SE29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
NL01.04.2005
Former [2006/12]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
AT28.09.2004
IE28.09.2004
SE29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
Former [2005/51]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
AT28.09.2004
IE28.09.2004
SE29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
Former [2005/46]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
IE28.09.2004
SE29.09.2004
Former [2005/23]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
SE29.09.2004
Former [2005/02]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
Former [2004/29]DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0119020  (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12,17-19,22-24,26-29 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 26 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 11 * * page 11 - page 12; examples 1,2 * * page 13; example 4 * * claims 1-6,13-15,17-24,26,28-32 *;
 [X]EP0186352  (TECHNICON INSTR [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12,17-19,22,26,28 * the whole document * * page 13, line 23 - line 25 *;
 [X]DE3335701  (LIPODERM PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CA]) [X] 1-4,8-12,17-19,22,26,28 * the whole document * * page 17 - page 18; example 3 *;
 [X]EP0087993  (DIOR CHRISTIAN PARFUMS [FR]) [X] 1-4,8-12,17-19,22,26,27 * page 24; example 10 *
 [A]  - J. FALBE U. M. REGITZ, RÖMPP-CHEMIE-LEXIKON, 9TH EDITION, VOL.3, STUTTGART (DE), GEORG THIEME VERLAG, [A] 5-8,13-16,30 *PAGES 1860-1861, "HPLC"*