Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0781497

EP0781497 - METHOD FOR RESTRICTING CHANNEL ACCESS DEPENDING ON SUBSCRIBER CLASSES AND SYSTEM LOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ionica International Limited
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 4AS / GB
[1997/27]
Inventor(s)01 / ALBROW, Richard, John
27 Lonsdale Linton
Cambridge CB1 6LT / GB
02 / BLACK, Simon, Alexander
52 Auckland Court Auckland Road
Cambridge CB5 8DS / GB
03 / CARTER, Leigh
50 Cantelupe Road
Haslingfield Cambridge CB3 7LU / GB
04 / GOODINGS, Rupert, Leslie, Alexander
33 Elizabeth Way
Cambridge CB4 1DD / GB
05 / MARTIN, Paul, Maxwell
9 Taylors Field Dullingham, Newmarket
Suffolk CB8 9XS / GB
06 / PIERCY, Neil, Philip
13 Harston Road Newton
Cambridge CB2 5PA / GB
[1997/27]
Representative(s)Hogg, Jeffery Keith , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
[2008/35]
Former [2000/22]Hogg, Jeffery Keith , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [1997/27]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date95931284.408.09.1995
[1997/27]
WO1995GB02133
Priority number, dateGB1994001874716.09.1994         Original published format: GB 9418747
[1997/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9608939
Date:21.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0781497
Date:02.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996
[1997/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0781497
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[1997/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DES KANALZUGRIFFS ABHÄNGIG VON TEILNEHMERKLASSEN UND SYSTEMLAST[1997/27]
English:METHOD FOR RESTRICTING CHANNEL ACCESS DEPENDING ON SUBSCRIBER CLASSES AND SYSTEM LOADING[1997/27]
French:PROCEDE DE RESTRICTION D'ACCES A UNE VOIE EN FONCTION DES CATEGORIES D'ABONNES ET DU CHARGEMENT DU SYSTEME[1997/27]
Entry into regional phase10.04.1997National basic fee paid 
10.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.04.1997Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
28.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2000Fee for grant paid
10.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
FR31.05.2000
GR31.05.2000
IT31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
NL31.05.2000
DK31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
LU08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
FR31.05.2000
GR31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
NL31.05.2000
DK31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
LU08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2004/39]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
GR31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
NL31.05.2000
DK31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
LU08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2004/07]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
GR31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
NL31.05.2000
DK31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2003/45]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
NL31.05.2000
DK31.08.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2003/09]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
NL31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2002/42]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2002/26]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2002/13]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
DE01.09.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2002/12]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
GB08.09.2000
IE08.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2002/02]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
IE08.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2001/50]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
IE08.09.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2001/27]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
SE31.08.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2001/24]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
FR27.10.2000
Former [2001/16]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT31.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]CA2063901  (NOVATEL COMMUNICATIONS LTD [CA]) [X] 1,7,9,13,14 * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 2 * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 4 *