Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0781100

EP0781100 - ANIMAL FEEDSTUFFS AND ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[1998/25]
Former [1997/27]For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CHANDLER, Peter, John
11 Washington Grove
Norton Cleveland TS20 1BU / GB
[1997/27]
Representative(s)Burford, Anthony Frederick , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/49]Burford, Anthony Frederick , et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Former [1998/25]Nott, Robert Michael Charles , et al
Cameron McKenna Mitre House 160 Aldersgate Street
London EC1A 4DD / GB
Former [1997/27]Roberts, Jonathan Winstanley
Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath
Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB
Application number, filing date95931322.215.09.1995
[1997/27]
WO1995GB02173
Priority number, dateGB1994001875216.09.1994         Original published format: GB 9418752
[1997/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9608168
Date:21.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0781100
Date:02.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996
[1997/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0781100
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/16, A23K1/18
[1997/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/27]
TitleGerman:FUTTERMITTEL UND FUTTERZUSATZMITTEL[1997/27]
English:ANIMAL FEEDSTUFFS AND ADDITIVES[1997/27]
French:ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX ET ADDITIFS[1997/27]
Entry into regional phase10.03.1997National basic fee paid 
10.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
15.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2000Fee for grant paid
29.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Request for further processing for:02.02.1998Request for further processing filed
02.02.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.02.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
FR19.07.2000
GR19.07.2000
IT19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
LU15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
DK19.10.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/39]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
FR19.07.2000
GR19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
LU15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
DK19.10.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
Former [2004/35]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
FR19.07.2000
GR19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
DK19.10.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
Former [2004/07]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
GR19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
DK19.10.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
DK19.10.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2003/09]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
NL19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2002/42]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
ES19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2002/13]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2002/12]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
GB19.10.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2002/02]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
CH19.07.2000
LI19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2001/50]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
IE15.09.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2001/27]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
PT19.10.2000
SE19.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2001/24]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
PT19.10.2000
FR15.12.2000
Former [2001/22]AT19.07.2000
BE19.07.2000
PT19.10.2000
Former [2001/18]AT19.07.2000
PT19.10.2000
Former [2001/17]AT19.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US5190775  (KLOSE ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1,5-9,11-13 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 37 * * column 6, line 10 - line 12 * * examples 1-16,20-27 * * claims 1-9 *;
 [X]US4948589  (IIJIMA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-13 * column W *;
 [X]WO9414335  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-13 * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 16, line 15 - line 20 * * page 22 - page 23; example 6 * * page 26; table 2 * * page 29, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *;
 [X]WO9415480  (MORGAN MFG CO INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-13 * page 3, line 12 - page 13, line 7 * * examples 3-5 * * claims 1-17 *;
 [A]US5093128  (DRAGUESKU OLIVER J [US], et al) [A] 1,5-9,11-13 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 21 * * column 3, line 6 - line 38 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH1010947  ;
 [A]US5314852  (KLATTE FRED [US]) [A] 1,2,12,13 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0158120  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column W *;
 [A]GB1426856  (SYNTEX INC) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890427), vol. 13, no. 182, Database accession no. (C - 591), [A] 1,5-9,11-13 * abstract *