Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0787121

EP0787121 - LEGIONELLA SPECIFIC ANTIBIOTIC, A MICROORGANISM PRODUCING THE ANTIBIOTIC AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHEIL FOODS & CHEMICALS, INC.
Cheil Building, 500, 5-ga, Namdaemun-ro, Chung-ku
Seoul 100-095 / KR
For all designated states
Korea Institute of Science and Technology
39-1 Hawollkog-dong, Sungbuk-ku
Seoul 136-791 / KR
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
CHEIL FOODS & CHEMICALS, INC.
Cheil Building, 500, 5-ga, Namdaemun-ro, Chung-ku
Seoul 100-095 / KR
For all designated states
KOREA INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
39-1 Hawollkog-dong, Sungbuk-ku
Seoul 136-791 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Yong, Woo Seonduk Apartment
3 dong 303 ho Jeongrung 4-dong Sungbuk-ku
Seoul 136-104 / KR
02 / LEE, Yeong, Seon Dongshin Apartment
704 dong 401 ho Shinwondangmaul Seongsa-dong
Goyang-city Kyunggi-do 411-020 / KR
03 / YON, Chang, Suek Woosung Apartment
8 dong 403 ho Dowha 2-dong Mapo-ku
Seoul 121-042 / KR
04 / SUH, Jung, Woo Shindonga Apartment
38 dong 103 ho Hakik 2-dong Nam-ku
Inchun-city 402-042 / KR
05 / LEE, Chul, Hoon Woochang Apartment
1 dong 304 ho Ogum-dong Songpa-ku
Seoul 138-130 / KR
06 / LIM, Yoong, Ho
1040-9, Beesan 3-dong Dongan-ku
Anyang-city Kyunggi-do 430-053 / KR
07 / YOO, Ick, Dong Hyundai Apartment
103 dong 301 ho Doryong-dong Yuseong-ku
Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR
[1997/32]
Representative(s)Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]Gervasi, Gemma, Dr.
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl, Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95931447.712.09.1995
[1997/32]
WO1995KR00117
Priority number, dateKR1994002358214.09.1994         Original published format: KR 9423582
KR1994002358314.09.1994         Original published format: KR 9423583
KR1994002358414.09.1994         Original published format: KR 9423584
[2000/17]
Former [1997/32]KR1994000023514.09.1994
KR1994000023514.09.1994
KR1994000023514.09.1994
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9608460
Date:21.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0787121
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996
[1997/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0787121
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT21.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C69/52, C12P17/02, // (C12P17/02, C12R1:465)
[1997/32]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL [1997/32]
TitleGerman:LEGIONELLA-SPEZIFISCHES ANTIBIOTIKUM, DASSELBIGE PRODUZIERENDER MIKROORGANISMUS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[1997/32]
English:LEGIONELLA SPECIFIC ANTIBIOTIC, A MICROORGANISM PRODUCING THE ANTIBIOTIC AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[1997/32]
French:ANTIBIOTIQUE SPECIFIQUE DE LEGIONELLA, MICRO-ORGANISME PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR CET ANTIBIOTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[1997/32]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase04.04.1997National basic fee paid 
04.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT
15.06.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1997/13]
22.10.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [1997/13]
04.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
29.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199905   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FR26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
IT26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DE27.07.2000
GB12.09.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]BE26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
FR26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DE27.07.2000
GB12.09.2000
Former [2004/07]BE26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DE27.07.2000
GB12.09.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2003/09]BE26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DE27.07.2000
GB12.09.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2002/26]BE26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
DE27.07.2000
GB12.09.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2002/13]BE26.04.2000
DE27.07.2000
GB12.09.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2002/12]BE26.04.2000
GB12.09.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2001/16]BE26.04.2000
FR22.09.2000
Former [2001/11]BE26.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 112, No. 23, 4 June 1990, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 504, Abstract No. 215293q, A.P. PCHELKIN et al., "Chromatographic Study of Diacylglycerol Mixture Obtained by Hydrolysis of Vegetable Oils"; & PRIKL. BIOKHIM. MIKROBIOL., 1988, 24(6), 809-15, (Russ).,
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 83, No. 9, 1 September 1975, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 603, Abstract No. 78516f, M.S. BAINOVA et al., "Synthesis and Properties of Minor Cryptoactive Triglycerides of Cocoa Butter"; & KHIM. PRIR. SOEDIN., 1975, 11(1), 8-11, (Russ).,
 [T]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 123, No. 17, 23 October 1995, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 571, Abstract No. 222428t, CH. YON et al., "AL072, A Novel Anti-Legionella Antibiotic Produced by Streptomyces Sp."; & J. ANTIBIOT., 1995, 48(8), 773-9, (Eng).,
ExaminationFR2692579