Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738447

EP0738447 - METHOD, POST-PROCESSING FILTER, AND VIDEO COMPRESSION SYSTEM FOR SUPPRESSING MOSQUITO AND BLOCKING ARTIFACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1996/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BRAILEAN, James, Charles
717 North Washington Avenue
Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola European IP Operations
Midpoint
Alencon Link
Basingstoke
Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/43]Morgan, Marc , et al
Motorola Eur. Intel. Prop. Op., Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date95931692.831.08.1995
[1996/43]
WO1995US11187
Priority number, dateUS1994033471804.11.1994         Original published format: US 334718
[1996/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9614708
Date:17.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738447
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738447
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.05.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/415, G06T5/00, H04N7/30
[1998/05]
Former International [1996/43]H04N1/415, G06T5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, NACHBEARBEITUNGSFILTER UND VIDEOKOMPRESSIONSSYSTEM ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON MOSKITO- UND BLOCKSTÖRUNGEN[1996/43]
English:METHOD, POST-PROCESSING FILTER, AND VIDEO COMPRESSION SYSTEM FOR SUPPRESSING MOSQUITO AND BLOCKING ARTIFACTS[1996/43]
French:PROCEDE, FILTRE DE POST-TRAITEMENT ET SYSTEME DE COMPRESSION VIDEO POUR ELIMINER LES ARTEFACTS DE TYPE MOUSTIQUES ET DE BLOCS[1996/43]
Entry into regional phase05.08.1996National basic fee paid 
05.08.1996Search fee paid 
05.08.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
14.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2001Fee for grant paid
15.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Former [2003/32]FR26.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[E]GB2287153  (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD) [E] 1,5,6 * abstract * * page 10, line 2 - line 4 * * page 18, line 17 - line 22 * * page 12, line 19 - line 24 * * page 9, line 10 - line 12 * * page 14, line 1 - line 11 * * page 15, line 4 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4794531  (MORISHITA KOICHI ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 8, line 20 - line 55 * * figure 17 *;
 [A]US4903128  (THOREAU DOMINIQUE) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * claims 1,2 *
 [X]  - AASE S O ET AL, "RINGING REDUCTION IN LOW BIT-RATE IMAGE SUBBAND CODING USING PROJECTION ONTO A SPACE OF PARABOLOIDS", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (19930501), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 273 - 282, XP000367174 [X] 10 * paragraph [04.3]; figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(93)90042-R
International search[X]US4754492  ;
 [YA]US4761819  ;
 [Y]US5294998
 [YA]  - PROCEEDINGS OF ICASSP, Volume 1, April 1994, LIU et al., "Adaptive Post-Processing Algorithms for Low Bit Rate Video Signals", pages V-401 - V-404.
 [A]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, Volume 41, No. 10, published October 1993, YAMAGUCHI, "Adaptive DCT Coding of Video Signals", pages 1534-1543.
 [A]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, Volume 39, No. 3, published August 1993, HSU et al., "A New Adaptive Seperable Median Filter for Removing Blocking Effects", pages 510-513.