blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0784648 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0784648



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 575
30.09.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.09.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
20.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.09.2010 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
20.09.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 3
20.09.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
20.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
21.06.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
25.05.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
12.03.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
19.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.01.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
28.01.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.01.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 30
28.01.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
28.01.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.01.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.01.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
31.08.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 14
15.05.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.11.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.11.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
07.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
07.05.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
22.10.2007 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
22.10.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.10.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
05.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.09.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.08.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
25.04.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.04.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 24
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.03.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 24
26.05.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.04.2006 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
07.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
07.03.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.03.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
07.03.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
07.03.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
28.10.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.10.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.10.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
07.10.2005 Description Search / examination 15
07.10.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.05.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2004 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 6
12.11.2003 Description Search / examination 2
12.11.2003 Description Search / examination 1
12.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 16
19.09.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.09.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.2003 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.02.2003 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.02.2003 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
11.07.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.06.2002 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
21.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 7
21.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 8
21.05.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 6
14.05.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 22
05.03.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.09.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
18.09.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
23.12.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
03.11.1999 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
30.08.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
23.08.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
07.05.1997 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.03.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
25.11.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
12.06.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.04.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.04.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 36
18.04.1996 Priority document Search / examination 40