blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0784648

Designated contracting states BELapse: 21.06.2006
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NLLapse: 21.06.2006
Examination procedure07.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase02.04.1997National basic fee paid 
02.04.1997Search fee paid 
02.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted21.06.2006
Opposition procedure20.09.2010Fee for printing new specification paid 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.07.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:23.07.1997 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19970402
 
Event date:02.02.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:02.02.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19991221
 
Event date:31.10.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010918
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20060621
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20060621
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:21.06.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:03.08.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69535076
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060803
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.12.2006 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:02.02.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:25.04.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:BROMINE COMPOUNDS LTD.
Effective DATE:20070320
 
Event date:27.10.2010 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20101027
 
Event date:27.10.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):BE DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20120829
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20120924
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.12.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20120910
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20120928
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:28.05.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130901
 
Event date:27.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20140530
 
Event date:10.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69535076 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130901
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130901
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930