Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0784648

EP0784648 - CONTINUOUS BROMINATION PROCESS AND PRODUCTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.09.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 27.10.2010  [2010/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette
Indiana 47906 / US
[2006/25]
Former [1997/30]For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200
West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MACK, Arthur, G.
5501 Blackberry Lane
Lafayette, IN 47905 / US
[1997/30]
Representative(s)Serravalle, Marco , et al
Serravalle SAS
Via G. Matteotti, 21/23
26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]Serravalle, Marco , et al
Serravalle sas Via G. Matteotti, 21/23
26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT
Former [2008/52]Serravalle, Marco , et al
Serravalle Sas Corso Roma, 120
26900 Lodi (LO) / IT
Former [2008/23]Serravalle, Marco
Serravalle s.a.s Via Don Losio, 10
26836 Montanaso Lombardo (LO) / IT
Former [2007/47]Spott, Gottfried
Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/30]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date95931696.901.09.1995
[1997/30]
WO1995US11197
Priority number, dateUS1994031807605.10.1994         Original published format: US 318076
[1997/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9611227
Date:18.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0784648
Date:23.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996
[1997/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0784648
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0784648
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.04.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/03, C08K5/04, C09K21/08, C07C43/29, C07C25/18
[1997/30]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/30]
TitleGerman:KONTINUIERLICHES BROMIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE[1997/30]
English:CONTINUOUS BROMINATION PROCESS AND PRODUCTS THEREOF[1997/30]
French:PROCEDE DE BROMURATION EN CONTINU ET PRODUITS RESULTANTS[1997/30]
Entry into regional phase02.04.1997National basic fee paid 
02.04.1997Search fee paid 
02.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
18.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2006Fee for grant paid
07.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007   
Bromine Compounds Ltd.
Makleff House P.O.B. 180
Beer-Sheva 84101 / IL
Opponent's representative
Long, Giorgio, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2007/17]
Opponent(s)01  20.03.2007   
Bromine Compounds Ltd.
Makleff House P.O.B. 180
Beer-Sheva 84101 / IL
Opponent's representative
Long, Giorgio, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
25.04.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.12.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.01.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.06.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.09.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:14.05.2002Request for further processing filed
15.05.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.06.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2007/16]BE21.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US5136107  (STEPHENS EDDIE M [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 9 * * example - * * column 8, line 48 - line 51 *;
 [XA]DE2950877  (KALK CHEMISCHE FABRIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * example 5 * * claims 1,3 * [A] 3,4,9-33;
 [XA]GB1436657  (ISC CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 1, line 71 - line 75; example . * * claims 1-5,9 * [A] 3,4,9;
 [XA]US4331821  (SCHUBART RUEDIGER, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 17 - line 19 * * column 3, line 53 - line 54 * * column 8, line 27 - line 31 * * examples 9,12A * * claims 1,6 * [A] 3-9
International search[X]US5055235  (BRACKENRIDGE DAVID R [US], et al);
 [X]US5039729  (BRACKENRIDGE DAVID R [US], et al);
 [Y]US5008477  (HUSSAIN SAADAT [US]);
 [Y]US4521633  (PEDJAC JOSEPH J [US]);
 [Y]US5210321  (MCKINNIE BONNIE G [US], et al)
OppositionEP0683795
 EP0781262
 US5017728
 US4287373