Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0772703

EP0772703 - SELVAGE-FORMING DEVICE FOR A MECHANICAL LOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Picanol N.V.
Polenlaan 3-7
8900 Ieper / BE
[1997/20]
Inventor(s)01 / SLOSSE, Kurt
Het Schuttershof 34
B-8904 Boezinge / BE
02 / GLORIE, Patrick
Werfstraat 40
B-8900 Ieper / BE
03 / MEYNS, Ignace
Oostpoeselstraat 7
B-8647 Reninge / BE
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Wilhelm & Dauster
Hospitalstrasse 8
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Hospitalstrasse 8
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95932777.620.09.1995
[1997/20]
WO1995EP03704
Priority number, dateBE1995000047429.05.1995         Original published format: BE 9500474
[1997/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9638608
Date:05.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0772703
Date:14.05.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0772703
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:D03C11/00
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/11]
Former [1997/20]BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:KANTENEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WEBMASCHINE[1997/20]
English:SELVAGE-FORMING DEVICE FOR A MECHANICAL LOOM[1997/20]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION DE LISIERES POUR METIER A TISSER[1997/20]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1997National basic fee paid 
14.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/20]
26.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.1999Fee for grant paid
06.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1151498  (DURAN MAGIN DESVEUS [ES]);
 [AD]EP0519550  (PICANOL NV [BE]);
 [AD]EP0306078  (PICANOL NV [BE])