Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0782556

EP0782556 - VITALIZING GRANULES CONTAINING ASH AND GYPSUM AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE GRANULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RESAMCO HB
Ask Upmarks Allé 58
256 57 Ramlösa / SE
For all designated states
MILJÖ- & EKOKONSULT BO FRANSMAN AB
Berguvsvägen 6
296 32 Ahus / SE
[1998/33]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
RESAMCO HB
Berguvsvägen 6
296 32 Ahus / SE
For all designated states
MILJÖ- & EKOKONSULT BO FRANSMAN AB
Berguvsvägen 6
296 32 Ahus / SE
Former [1997/28]For all designated states
RESAMCO HB
Berguvsvägen 6
296 32 Ahus / SE
Inventor(s)01 / FRANSMAN, Bo
Berguvsvägen 6
S-296 32 Ahus / SE
02 / GÖTHE, Klas
Tryggögatan 14
S-257 30 Rydebäck / SE
[1997/28]
Representative(s)Thylén, Eva Matilda , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1997/28]Thylén, Eva Matilda , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date95933687.621.09.1995
[1997/28]
WO1995SE01079
Priority number, dateSE1994000322523.09.1994         Original published format: SE 9403225
[1997/28]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9609268
Date:28.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0782556
Date:09.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1996
[1997/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0782556
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C05D9/00, // C05F5/00
[1997/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   SE [1997/28]
TitleGerman:GIPS UND ASCHE ENTHALTENDE GRANULATE ZUR ANREICHERUNG VON BÖDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESER GRANULATE[1997/28]
English:VITALIZING GRANULES CONTAINING ASH AND GYPSUM AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE GRANULES[1997/28]
French:GRANULES D'ENRICHISSEMENT DE SOLS CONTENANT DE LA CENDRE ET DU GYPSE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DESDITS GRANULES[1997/28]
Entry into regional phase28.03.1996Translation filed 
22.03.1997National basic fee paid 
22.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/28]
27.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1999Fee for grant paid
20.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199804   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
DE20.04.2000
[2003/45]
Former [2002/23]SE19.01.2000
DE20.04.2000
Former [2002/11]DE20.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3921805  ;
 [X]JP47047186B  ;
 [A]DE3913883
 [X]  - DATABASE WPIL ON QUESTEL, Week 7250, London: DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., AN 72-78924T; & JP,B,47 047 186, (KAWANO T)., & JP47047186B B 00000000