Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731886

EP0731886 - DEVICE FOR LUBRICATING A COUPLING BETWEEN TWO MUTUALLY MOVABLE MECHANICAL PARTS, PARTICULARLY A CONNECTING ROD/PISTON COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Melchior, Jean Frédéric
126 Boulevard du Montparnasse
F-75014 Paris / FR
[1996/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/38]
Representative(s)Bernasconi, Jean Raymond
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Bernasconi, Jean Raymond
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [1996/38]Bernasconi, Jean
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date95934167.804.10.1995
[1996/38]
WO1995FR01289
Priority number, dateFR1994001184204.10.1994         Original published format: FR 9411842
[1996/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9610706
Date:11.04.1996
Language:FR
[1996/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0731886
Date:18.09.1996
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1996
[1996/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731886
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16J1/22, F16C11/06
[1996/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/38]
TitleGerman:SCHMIERVORRICHTUNG EINES ZUSAMMENBAUS VON ZWEI MECHANISCH VERBUNDENEN TEILEN, BZW. KOLBEN UND PLEUELSTANGE[1996/38]
English:DEVICE FOR LUBRICATING A COUPLING BETWEEN TWO MUTUALLY MOVABLE MECHANICAL PARTS, PARTICULARLY A CONNECTING ROD/PISTON COUPLING[1996/38]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LUBRIFICATION D'UN ASSEMBLAGE ENTRE DEUX PIECES MECANIQUES MOBILES L'UNE PAR RAPPORT A L'AUTRE, NOTAMMENT ARTICULATION BIELLE-PISTON[1996/38]
Entry into regional phase07.06.1996National basic fee paid 
07.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
09.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.1999Fee for grant paid
06.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT26.01.2000
DE27.04.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2002/11]DE27.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0280622  (MELCHIOR JEAN F) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [A]EP0451011  (MELCHIOR JEAN F [FR]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]GB551362  (VICKERS INC, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *