Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0761014

EP0761014 - SIMPLIFIED DUAL DAMASCENE PROCESS FOR MULTILEVEL METALLIZATION AND INTERCONNECTION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Richard, J.
1035 Hamilton Avenue
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / HUI, Angela
2139 Devon Place
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
03 / CHEUNG, Robin
19889 Baywood Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / CHANG, Mark
1881 Farndon Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
05 / LIN, Ming-Ren
10970 Santa Teresa Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]Brookes Batchellor
102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Former [1997/11]Wright, Hugh Ronald , et al
Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date95935091.925.09.1995
[1997/11]
WO1995US12194
Priority number, dateUS1994032051611.10.1994         Original published format: US 320516
[1997/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9612297
Date:25.04.1996
[1996/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0761014
Date:12.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996
[1997/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0761014
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/768
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/11]
TitleGerman:VEREINFACHTER DOPPEL-DAMASZENEN PROZESS FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRLAGEN-METALLISIERUNG UND EINER VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR[1997/11]
English:SIMPLIFIED DUAL DAMASCENE PROCESS FOR MULTILEVEL METALLIZATION AND INTERCONNECTION STRUCTURE[1997/11]
French:PROCEDE SIMPLIFIE DE DOUBLE DAMASQUINAGE SERVANT A EFFECTUER UNE METALLISATION A DES NIVEAUX MULTIPLES ET A REALISER UNE STRUCTURE D'INTERCONNEXION[1997/11]
Entry into regional phase14.11.1996National basic fee paid 
14.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/11]
28.01.1997Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
31.01.1997Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
05.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2003Fee for grant paid
07.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.10.1996DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1996
28.10.1996FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1996
28.10.1996GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1996
28.10.1996IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1996
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.07.2003
IT09.07.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR09.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0463972  (HARTMANN) [X] 1-11,14-22,25-28,68-70,93 * column 7, line 26 - column 9, line 35 * * idem * [Y] 12,13,23,24,29;
 [Y]EP0425787  (KOTECHA ET AL) [Y] 12,13,23,24,29 * column 8, line 9 - line 21; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0224013  (CHOW ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-18,20-25,68,69 * figures 2-6 *;
 [X]EP0435187  (KOBAYASHI) [X] 30,31,33-39,42,43,45-47,71,72,79,80,82-88,91,92 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US4996167  (CHEN) [X] 30-33,35,42,71,79-81,92 * figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US4472240  (KAMEYAMA) [X] 50,51,53-56,61,73,74 * figures 8,9 *;
 [A]US4801350  (MATTOX ET AL) [A] 75-78 * column A *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Methods of forming small contact holes", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198801), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 252 - 253, XP000097503 [A] 93,94 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - KAANTA ET AL, "Dual damascene : a ULSI wiring technology", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 8TH INT. IEEE VLSI MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONF., SANTA CLARA, CA, USA, JUNE 11-12, 1991, pages 144 - 152, XP002002163 [DA] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VMIC.1991.152978