Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0737031

EP0737031 - AN IMPLEMENT FOR MILKING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAASLAND N.V.
Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[1996/42]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER LELY, Ary
Weverskade 10A
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
02 / VAN DEN BERG, Karel
Boterbloemstraat 5
NL-2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL
[1996/42]
Representative(s)Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Corten, Maurice Jean F.M. , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Former [1996/42]Mulder, Herman , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date95935612.217.10.1995
[1996/42]
WO1995NL00356
Priority number, dateNL1994000180231.10.1994         Original published format: NL 9401802
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9613151
Date:09.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0737031
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996
[1996/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0737031
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0737031
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/017, A01J7/04
[1996/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1996/42]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM MELKEN VON TIEREN[1996/42]
English:AN IMPLEMENT FOR MILKING ANIMALS[1996/42]
French:APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRAIRE LES ANIMAUX[1996/42]
Entry into regional phase05.07.1996National basic fee paid 
05.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
10.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2000Fee for grant paid
12.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.01.2001  07.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion B.V.
Kromme Spieringweg 248B
2140 AA Vijfhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf
P.O. Box 3
2050 AA Overveen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2001/13]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2001  07.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion B.V.
Kromme Spieringweg 248B
2140 AA Vijfhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
Uittenbogaart, Gustaaf Adolf (NL)
P.O. Box 3
2050 AA Overveen / NL
02.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
11.10.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.10.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.06.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.06.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.12.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.01.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition07.11.2002Appeal received No.  T1138/02
30.01.2003Statement of grounds filed
30.06.2004Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
30.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
12.07.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]NL8602505  (VAN DER LELY) [A] 1,28,31 * page 1, line 14 - page 2, line 17 * * page 8, line 18 - line 24 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0222574  (THE DIRECTOR GENERAL OF THE MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE AND FISHERIES) [A] 1 * page 9, line 1 - line 5 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0349019  (VAN DER LELY) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 3 - line 25 *;
 [DA]EP0476771  (VAN DER LELY) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *
ExaminationEP0476771
 EP0630558
 EP0277396
 WO9412019