Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0786053

EP0786053 - LOCKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mercado Medic AB
Box 1074
181 22 Lidingö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]For all designated states
MERCADO MEDIC AB
Box 1074
S-181 22 Lidingö / SE
Inventor(s)01 / DU REES, Stephan
Södra Kungsvägen 210A
S-181 62 Lidingö / SE
[1997/31]
Representative(s)Bjelkstam, Peter , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Bjelkstam, Peter , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [1997/31]Bjelkstam, Peter , et al
Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date95935642.918.10.1995
[1997/31]
WO1995SE01224
Priority number, dateSE1994000355918.10.1994         Original published format: SE 9403559
[1997/31]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9612113
Date:25.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0786053
Date:30.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996
[1997/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0786053
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE25.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16B12/40, F16B7/14
[1997/31]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1997/31]
TitleGerman:VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG[1997/31]
English:LOCKING DEVICE[1997/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE[1997/31]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1995Translation filed 
17.02.1997National basic fee paid 
17.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
18.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
16.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.1999Fee for grant paid
24.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH26.01.2000
FR26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
GB18.10.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2002/12]CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
GB18.10.2000
Former [2001/09]CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2000/52]CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH01.05.2000
LI01.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]SE428243  (HOISETH JOHN WILLY);
 [A]WO8603562  (HOEISETH JOHN);
 [A]US3463520  (TURRO JEROME C)