Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0787265

EP0787265 - A DISC BRAKE CALIPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haldex Brake Products Aktiebolag
Box 501
261 24 Landskrona / SE
[1999/31]
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
Haldex AB
Box 501
S-261 24 Landskrona / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SEVERINSSON, Lars
S-310 21 Hishult / / SE
[1997/32]
Representative(s)Petri, Stellan , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1997/32]Petri, Stellan , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date95936177.524.10.1995
[1997/32]
WO1995SE01258
Priority number, dateSE1994000362424.10.1994         Original published format: SE 9403624
[1997/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9612900
Date:02.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0787265
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996
[1997/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0787265
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE02.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/16, F16D65/56, F16D55/226
[1997/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/32]
TitleGerman:BREMSSATTEL[1997/32]
English:A DISC BRAKE CALIPER[1997/32]
French:ETRIER DE FREIN A DISQUE[1997/32]
Entry into regional phase17.03.1997National basic fee paid 
17.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
17.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Fee for grant paid
11.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99106483.3  / EP0942191
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
GR09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
PT09.05.2000
IE24.10.2000
LU24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
GR09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
PT09.05.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2003/45]AT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
PT09.05.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/42]AT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
IE24.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/17]AT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
IE24.10.2000
Former [2001/09]AT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT09.02.2000
CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
Former [2000/52]CH09.02.2000
LI09.02.2000
Former [2000/50]CH15.05.2000
LI15.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9322579  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al);
 [A]WO9428331  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al)