EP0802813 - DOSIMETRIC SPACER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIC-AID LIMITED Town Quay House, 7 Town Quay Southampton SO14 2PT / GB | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Medic-Aid Limited Town Quay House, 7 Town Quay Southampton SO14 2PT / GB | ||
For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | |||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Medic-Aid Limited Town Quay House, 7 Town Quay Southampton SO14 2PT / GB | ||
For all designated states AB Astra 151 85 Södertälje / SE | |||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states MEDIC-AID LIMITED Hook Lane Pagham, Sussex PO21 3PP / GB | ||
For all designated states AB Astra 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENYER, Jonathan, Stanley, Harold 6 Wolsey Close Pagham West Sussex PO21 3LQ / GB | 02 /
NIKANDER, Kurt, Verner, Holger Lyckevägen 6 S-240 10 Dalby / SE | [2000/18] |
Former [1997/44] | 01 /
DENYER, Jonathan, Stanley, Harold 6 Wolsey Close Pagham West Sussex PO21 3LQ / GB | ||
02 /
NIKANDER, Kurt, Verner, Holger Lyckevagen 6 S-240 10 Dalby / SE | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn, London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95936570.1 | 27.10.1995 | [1997/44] | WO1995EP04254 | Priority number, date | GB19940021687 | 27.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421687 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613294 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802813 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802813 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M15/0088 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0015 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/003 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/064, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/44] | Extension states | LT | 09.05.1997 | LV | 09.05.1997 | SI | 09.05.1997 | Title | German: | DOSIMETER | [1999/31] | English: | DOSIMETRIC SPACER | [1997/44] | French: | APPAREIL DOSIMETRIQUE DU TYPE "SPACER" | [1997/44] |
Former [1997/44] | ABSTANDSHALTER FÜR EIN DOSIMETER | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 03.05.2000 | [2008/24] | Cited in | International search | [A]CA1317194 (IRSST INST DE RECH EN SANTE ET) [A] 1,2,20,21 * page 26, line 33 - page 28, line 8; figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]GB2137886 (WB PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED) [A] 1,2,20,21 * abstract * * page 1, line 65 - line 82 * * page 2, line 49 - line 73 *; | [A]WO9215353 (MIRIS MEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,20,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - line 35 * * page 3, line 8 - line 14 * * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 24 * * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 17 * * page 26, line 22 - line 32 * * page 27, line 20 - line 26 * * page 29, line 6 - line 11 *; | [A]US5156776 (LOEDDING HUBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,20,21 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - line 63 ** column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 21 * |