Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828945

EP0828945 - PILOT CONTROLLED SERVO-VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYDROLUX S.A.R.L.
1, rue de l'Aciérie
1112 Luxembourg / LU
[1998/12]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURKEL, Arsène
12, rue de la Gare
L-4460 Belvaux / LU
02 / LANFERMANN, Bernd
Galaystrasse 11
D-46459 Rees / DE
03 / TRATBERGER, Karl
Martinistrasse 2
D-47229 Duisburg / DE
04 / POST, Karl-Heinz
Rosenstrasse 15
D-41564 Kaarst / DE
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Schmitt, Armand
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A.
234, route d'Arlon
B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]Schmitt, Armand
Office de brevets, Ernest T. Freylinger, 321, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date95937068.513.11.1995
[1998/12]
WO1995EP04454
Priority number, dateLU1994008855816.11.1994         Original published format: LU 88558
[1998/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9615373
Date:23.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828945
Date:18.03.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828945
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:F15B13/042
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/12]
TitleGerman:VORGESTEUERTES SERVOVENTIL[1998/12]
English:PILOT CONTROLLED SERVO-VALVE[1998/12]
French:SERVO-SOUPAPE A COMMANDE PILOTE[1998/12]
Entry into regional phase08.04.1997National basic fee paid 
08.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.04.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
25.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2002Fee for grant paid
15.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.09.2002
GB11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
AT13.11.2002
[2004/34]
Former [2004/21]GB11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
AT13.11.2002
Former [2004/14]NL11.09.2002
AT13.11.2002
Former [2003/22]NL11.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[PY]DE4417204  (HYDROLUX SARL [LU]) [PY] 1-6 * column 7, line 66 - column 13, line 9; figure - *;
 [Y]DE4011908  (FESTO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3234968  (FRANTZ VIRGIL L) [A] 1 * column 2, line 23 - column 7, line 45; figure - *;
 [A]US3010438  (FIFE IRWIN L, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 33 - column 7, line 64; figure - *