Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0782439

EP0782439 - BIOCOMPATIBLE COATING, MEDICAL DEVICE USING THE SAME AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.06.2005  [2005/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Surface Genesis, Inc.
777 Pastoria Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/28]For all designated states
Surface Genesis, Inc.
777 Pastoria
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SUBRAMANIAM, Raj
4749 Mallard Common
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
[1997/28]
Representative(s)Baldock, Sharon Claire , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/28]Baldock, Sharon Claire , et al
Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date95937442.213.10.1995
[1997/28]
WO1995US13171
Priority number, dateUS1994032441317.10.1994         Original published format: US 324413
[1997/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9611668
Date:25.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0782439
Date:09.07.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996
[1997/28]
Search report(s)International search reportUS25.04.1996
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, C12N11/08, A61L33/00, A61L33/12
[2000/28]
Former International [1997/28]A61K9/00, C12N11/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/28]
TitleGerman:BIOKOMPATIBLER ÜBERZUG, MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN UND VERFAHREN[1997/28]
English:BIOCOMPATIBLE COATING, MEDICAL DEVICE USING THE SAME AND METHODS[1997/28]
French:REVETEMENT BIOCOMPATIBLE, DISPOSITIF MEDICAL UTILISANT CE REVETEMENT ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES[1997/28]
Entry into regional phase11.04.1997National basic fee paid 
11.04.1997Search fee paid 
11.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/28]
12.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/25]
25.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/25]
Request for further processing for:24.02.2004Request for further processing filed
24.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.03.2004Decision despatched
02.06.2003Request for further processing filed
02.06.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.06.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
03.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200208   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9303776  (GALIN MILES A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-13,20,22-25,28,29 * page 13, line 4 - line 21 * * example 3 * [Y] 1,7,9;
 [X]US5338770  (WINTERS SUZANNE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-13,20,22-25,28,29 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 16 * * column 12, line 44 - line 61 * * example 3 *;
 [X]US5336518  (NARAYANAN PALLASSANA V [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-13,20,22-25,28,29 * column 4, line 43 - line 68 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]US4929602  (HARKER LAURENCE A [US], et al) [Y] 1,7 * column 3, line 6 - line 15 * * column 4, line 29 - line 48 *;
 [Y]EP0168342  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1,9 * abstract * * page 8 *
International search[X]US5324647  (RUBENS FRASER D [US], et al);
 [Y]US5217492  (GUIRE PATRICK [US], et al)