Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0737341

EP0737341 - DATAFORM READERS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METANETICS CORPORATION
Suite 101, 43 Barkley Circle
Fort Myers, FL 33907 / US
[1996/42]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Ynjiun, P.
8235-17 Red Cedar Drive
Fort Myers, FL 33907 / US
02 / JU, Paul, P.
1745-7 Red Cedar Drive
Fort Myers, FL 33907 / US
[1996/42]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/02]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1996/42]Waldren, Robin Michael , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date95937700.331.10.1995
[1996/42]
WO1995US14219
Priority number, dateUS1994033259231.10.1994         Original published format: US 332592
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9613799
Date:09.05.1996
[1996/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0737341
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996
[1996/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0737341
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[1996/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/42]
TitleGerman:DATENFORMLESER UND -VERFAHREN[1996/42]
English:DATAFORM READERS AND METHODS[1996/42]
French:LECTEURS DE FORMES DE DONNEES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES[1996/42]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1996National basic fee paid 
29.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
25.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2001Fee for grant paid
22.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199703   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1998
31.10.200006   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0602637  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,12,17,23,29 * column 13, line 1 - line 13 * * column 14, line 15 - line 30 * * figure 8 *;
 [A]EP0498366  (PSC INC [US]) [A] 1,12,17,23,29 * page 12, line 44 - line 51 *
ExaminationWO9419764