Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0796948

EP0796948 - Pile head treating tool for cast-in-place and pile head treating method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/39]PILE HEAD TREATING TOOL FOR CAST-IN-PLACE PILE, PILE HEAD TREATING METHOD, AND CAST-IN-PLACE PILING METHOD
[2001/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Okawa, Shogen
11-5, Matsuehigashi 4-chome, Wakayama-shi
Wakayama 640 / JP
[1997/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/39]
Representative(s)Hillier, Peter
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/39]Hillier, Peter
Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane
London, WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date95938611.127.11.1995
[1997/39]
WO1995JP02438
Priority number, dateJP1994030058305.12.1994         Original published format: JP 30058394
JP1995022821505.09.1995         Original published format: JP 22821595
JP1995028364531.10.1995         Original published format: JP 28364595
[1997/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9618001
Date:13.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0796948
Date:24.09.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996
[1997/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0796948
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:E02D5/34, E02D9/00
[1999/18]
Former International [1997/39]E02D5/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/39]
TitleGerman:Pfahlkopfbehandlungswerkzeug für einen vor Ort geformten Pfahl, und Pfahlkopfbehandlungsverfahren[2001/36]
English:Pile head treating tool for cast-in-place and pile head treating method[2001/36]
French:Outil à traiter les têtes de pieux coulés sur place et procédé de traitement de têtes de pieux[2001/36]
Former [1997/39]PFAHLKOPFBEHANDLUNGSWERKZEUG FÜR EINEN VOR ORT GEFORMTEN PFAHL, PFAHLKOPFBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN, UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PFÄHLEN AUS ORTBETON
Former [1997/39]PILE HEAD TREATING TOOL FOR CAST-IN-PLACE PILE, PILE HEAD TREATING METHOD, AND CAST-IN-PLACE PILING METHOD
Former [1997/39]OUTIL A TRAITER LES TETES DE PIEUX COULES SUR PLACE, PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE TETES DE PIEUX ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE PIEUX COULES SUR PLACE
Entry into regional phase30.06.1997Translation filed 
01.07.1997National basic fee paid 
01.07.1997Search fee paid 
01.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
01.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
11.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.05.2002Fee for grant paid
01.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
DE28.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2004/35]FR25.09.2002
DE28.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]DE28.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/45]DE28.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]CH683197  (EGGSTEIN AG) [X] 7 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 53; figure . * [A] 8;
 [A]JPS6030714
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850629), vol. 009, no. 155, Database accession no. (M - 392), [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH01322020  (OKAWA MASAHARU);
 [Y]JPH01219214  (TAMOTO SHUZO);
 [Y]JPS60119815  (HASEGAWA KOMUTEN KK);
 [Y]JPS5880020  (HASEGAWA KOMUTEN KK);
 [Y]JPH04149313  (TAISEI CORP);
 [Y]JPS491007