Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0792276

EP0792276 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING HIGH-PERCENTAGE POWDERY PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peter, Siegfried, Prof. Dr.
Lindenweg 3
91080 Uttenreuth-Weiher / DE
[1997/36]
Inventor(s)01 / PETER, Siegfried
Lindenweg 3
D-91080 Uttenreuth-Weiher / DE
02 / WEIDNER, Eckhard
Am Dorfweiher 9
D-91056 Erlangen / DE
03 / ZHANG, Zhengfeng
Sieglitzhofer Strasse 21
D-91054 Erlangen / DE
[1997/36]
Representative(s)Weinhold, Peter , et al
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner
Röss, Kaiser, Polte
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/36]Weinhold, Peter, Dr. , et al
Kuhnen, Wacker & Partner, Alois-Steinecker-Str. 22
85254 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date95939270.513.11.1995
[1997/36]
WO1995EP04457
Priority number, dateDE1994444083115.11.1994         Original published format: DE 4440831
[1997/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9615133
Date:23.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0792276
Date:03.09.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996
[1997/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0792276
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/10, A23J7/00
[1997/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HOCHPROZENTIGEN, PULVERFÖRMIGEN PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINEN[1997/36]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING HIGH-PERCENTAGE POWDERY PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINES[1997/36]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PHOSPHATIDYLCHOLINES PULVERULENTES DE HAUTE PURETE[1997/36]
Entry into regional phase14.05.1997National basic fee paid 
14.05.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/36]
02.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1999Fee for grant paid
01.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9319617  (PETER SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0352667  (PETER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0615694  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2072189  (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0156374  (MEYER LUCAS GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0259836  (PETER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE2141356  (CHEVRON RES) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *